This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/13/2023 at 22:27:50 (UTC).

SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION DBA SHAWNAN VS ECOLOGY AUTO PARTS, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/03/2020 SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION DBA SHAWNAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ECOLOGY AUTO PARTS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BRIAN F. GASDIA, OLIVIA ROSALES and MARGARET MILLER BERNAL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0622

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BRIAN F. GASDIA

OLIVIA ROSALES

MARGARET MILLER BERNAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION DBA SHAWNAN

Cross Defendants, Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ECOLOGY AUTO PARTS INC.

MCFANN VIRGINA DBA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RICHARDSON JOEL BRENT

Defendant Attorneys

GRIFFIN JOHN THOMAS

JAMARNE JEAN PAUL

ESQ. STEPHEN YOUNGERMAN

BEAUMONT NANETTE M.

Cross Defendant Attorney

ALDERMAN DANIEL SETH

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

4/11/2023: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS THE COMPLAINT, 11/3/2020

4/6/2023: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS THE COMPLAINT, 11/3/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) PURSUANT TO 66...)

2/17/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) PURSUANT TO 66...)

Notice of Settlement

2/16/2023: Notice of Settlement

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

2/14/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) PURSUANT TO 66...)

1/19/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) PURSUANT TO 66...)

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

1/17/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) PURSUANT TO 664.6 C.C.P.

11/21/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) PURSUANT TO 664.6 C.C.P.

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) PURSUANT TO 66...)

11/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) PURSUANT TO 66...)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

11/8/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

9/8/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

9/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

9/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/2/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

8/2/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

6/1/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ECOLOGY AUTO PARTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE; DECLARATION OF NANETTE BEAUMONT IN SUPPORT THEREOF

5/19/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ECOLOGY AUTO PARTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE; DECLARATION OF NANETTE BEAUMONT IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

5/19/2022: Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2023
  • Hearing04/19/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department R at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: Sialic Contractors Corporation dba Shawnan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Sialic Contractors Corporation dba Shawnan on 11/03/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Sialic Contractors Corporation dba Shawnan as to Ecology Auto Parts, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Without Prejudice as the Complaint, 11/3/2020; Filed by: Sialic Contractors Corporation dba Shawnan (Plaintiff); As to: Ecology Auto Parts, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) Pursuant to 66...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketPursuant to oral stipulation, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) Pursuant to 664.6 CCP- Non-Appearance Calendar scheduled for 02/17/2023 at 09:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department R Held - Continued was rescheduled to 04/19/2023 09:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: Sialic Contractors Corporation dba Shawnan (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketNotice Notice of Remote Appearance; Filed by: Sialic Contractors Corporation dba Shawnan (Plaintiff); As to: Sialic Contractors Corporation dba Shawnan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) Pursuant to 66...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) Pursuant to 664.6 CCP- Non-Appearance Calendar scheduled for 01/19/2023 at 09:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department R Held - Continued was rescheduled to 02/17/2023 09:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
83 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Ecology Auto Parts, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Sialic Contractors Corporation dba Shawnan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketAddress for Joel Brent Richardson (Attorney) customer request

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Sialic Contractors Corporation dba Shawnan (Plaintiff); As to: Ecology Auto Parts, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 11/04/2020; Service Cost: 53.90; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/04/2021 at 01:30 PM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Sialic Contractors Corporation dba Shawnan (Plaintiff); As to: Ecology Auto Parts, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Sialic Contractors Corporation dba Shawnan (Plaintiff); As to: Ecology Auto Parts, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Sialic Contractors Corporation dba Shawnan (Plaintiff); As to: Ecology Auto Parts, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Margaret Miller Bernal in Department F Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less