This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/22/2021 at 01:52:14 (UTC).

SHRIVASTAVA, PRATEEK VS SHRIVASTAVA, VIPASHA

Case Summary

On 07/08/2021 SHRIVASTAVA, PRATEEK filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SHRIVASTAVA, VIPASHA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7669

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SHRIVASTAVA PRATEEK

Respondent

SHRIVASTAVA VIPASHA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

WHITMARSH MICHAEL L

SKLAN JEFFREY FREDRICH

Respondent Attorneys

MILES JOY KRAFT

MILES JOY WREN

 

Court Documents

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

7/8/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Notice - Case Assignment

7/8/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

Declaration - UCCJEA

7/8/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

7/8/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

7/8/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Summons

7/8/2021: Summons

Proof of Service of Summons

7/19/2021: Proof of Service of Summons

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

8/4/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Proof of Service - electronic service re: Response to Dissolution of Marriage, UCCJEA Declaration etc.

8/3/2021: Proof of Service - electronic service re: Response to Dissolution of Marriage, UCCJEA Declaration etc.

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

8/3/2021: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Declaration - UCCJEA

8/3/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

8/24/2021: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Declaration - Income and Expense

8/30/2021: Declaration - Income and Expense

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

8/26/2021: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Declaration - Income and Expense

8/26/2021: Declaration - Income and Expense

Substitution of Attorney

9/20/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Request - Trial Setting

10/8/2021: Request - Trial Setting

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketRequest - Trial Setting; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (electronic service re: Response to Dissolution of Marriage, UCCJEA Declaration etc. ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILES JOY WREN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILES JOY KRAFT