This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/08/2022 at 03:18:36 (UTC).

SHORTER, ARTHUR, JR - IN THE MATTER OF

Case Summary

On 03/18/2021 SHORTER, ARTHUR, JR - IN THE MATTER OF was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTIAN, DEBORAH L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2554

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTIAN, DEBORAH L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SHORTER MISHEILYA

Not Classified By Court

SHORTER ARTHUR JR

GUTIERREZ RUBEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

STRICKLAND MICHELLE DENISE

 

Court Documents

Petition - Determine Succession to Real Prop (Initial)

3/18/2021: Petition - Determine Succession to Real Prop (Initial)

Minute Order

8/6/2021: Minute Order

Supplement

8/5/2021: Supplement

Declaration

8/5/2021: Declaration

Inventory & Appraisal - Inventory and Appraisal - Final

9/9/2021: Inventory & Appraisal - Inventory and Appraisal - Final

Minute Order

9/20/2021: Minute Order

Ex Parte - Order

10/6/2021: Ex Parte - Order

Ex Parte - Application Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Ex Parte - Application Nunc Pro Tunc Order

9/30/2021: Ex Parte - Application Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Ex Parte - Application Nunc Pro Tunc Order

Declaration - Declaration

9/30/2021: Declaration - Declaration

PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

9/29/2021: PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

Order

3/1/2022: Order

PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

2/17/2022: PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketOrder

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketRejected Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketEx Parte - Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketEx Parte - Application Nunc Pro Tunc Order (Ex Parte - Application Nunc Pro Tunc Order ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketRejected Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 44, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding; Petition Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketPetition Granted (Petition - Determine Succession to Real Prop (Initial) filed on March 18, 2021 by Misheilya Shorter. )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketInventory & Appraisal (Inventory and Appraisal - Final ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 44, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding; Petition Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketSupplement; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketPetition - Determine Succession to Real Prop (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STRICKLAND MICHELLE