Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/20/2019 at 02:57:23 (UTC).

SHOREH ERSHADI PH D ET AL VS DARIUSH G ADLI ESQ ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/03/2017 SHOREH ERSHADI PH D filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against DARIUSH G ADLI ESQ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN P. DOYLE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2411

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN P. DOYLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

ERSHADI SHOREH PH.D

ANTIAGING INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA INC.

Defendants and Respondents

ADLI LAW GROUP P.C.

ADLI DARISH G. ESQ.

DOES 1 - 20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

KUNSTLER PETER M. ESQ.

SPITZER DANIEL B. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

ALDI DARIUSH G.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR LEGAL MALPRACTICE AND BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY

11/3/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR LEGAL MALPRACTICE AND BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/29/2018: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

ORDER ON STIPULATION FOR FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/29/2018: ORDER ON STIPULATION FOR FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order

7/13/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

7/16/2018: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

Notice of Lien

10/23/2018: Notice of Lien

Request for Dismissal

1/9/2019: Request for Dismissal

Unknown

1/11/2019: Unknown

Minute Order

4/9/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

2/22/2018: Unknown

CROSS-DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

2/27/2018: CROSS-DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Minute Order

3/1/2018: Minute Order

ADLI LAW GROUP, P.C.'S CROSS-COMPLAINT AGAINST SHOREH ERSHADI AND ANTIAGING INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

1/30/2018: ADLI LAW GROUP, P.C.'S CROSS-COMPLAINT AGAINST SHOREH ERSHADI AND ANTIAGING INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

Unknown

2/2/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

2/2/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

1/23/2018: Unknown

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/8/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

SUMMONS

11/3/2017: SUMMONS

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 58; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 58; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 58; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 58; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Post-Mediation Status Conference: Status Conference) of 01/11/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Minute Order ((Post-Mediation Status Conference: Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Shoreh, Ph.D Ershadi (Plaintiff); Antiaging Institute of California, Inc. (Plaintiff); Darish G. Adli, Esq. (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • Notice of Lien

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 58; Status Conference (Status Conference; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 01/02/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR LEGAL MALPRACTICE AND BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Shoreh, Ph.D Ershadi (Plaintiff); Antiaging Institute of California, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Antiaging Institute of California, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ADLI LAW GROUP P.C. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KUNSTLER PETER M.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SPITZER DANIEL BRUCE