Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 04:24:56 (UTC).

SHOOSHANIK CHARKHCHIAN VS BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/30/2017 SHOOSHANIK CHARKHCHIAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DENNIS J. LANDIN, ELIZABETH R. FEFFER, GREGORY W. ALARCON, RICHARD E. RICO and JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3223

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DENNIS J. LANDIN

ELIZABETH R. FEFFER

GREGORY W. ALARCON

RICHARD E. RICO

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CHARKHCHIAN SHOOSHANIK

Defendants and Respondents

BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA

ANTHEM BLUE CROSS

LOGISTICARE SOLUTIONS LLC

DOES 1 TO 100

CROSS ANTHEM BLUE

BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA DBA ANTHEM BLUE CROSS

Interested Party

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

TASHJIAN ARMEN M. ESQ.

ARMEN M. TASHJIAN LAW OFFICES OF

TASHJIAN ARMEN MICHAEL

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

FOLEY & LARDNER LLP [SF]

FOLEY & LARDNER LLP [LA]

COZEN O'CONNOR

O'CONNOR COZEN

FLYNN VIRGINA BELL

WU JASON YON-WAI

FULLER CHAD R

KARGHER ALEXANDER M.

Other Attorneys

KLINSPORT KIMBERLY ANN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

12/2/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/3/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JESSICA LOHR

8/12/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JESSICA LOHR

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO GRANT APPLICATION TO APPEA...)

11/2/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO GRANT APPLICATION TO APPEA...)

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT LOGISTICARE SOLUTIONS, LLCS (UNTIMELY) MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET TWO; DECLARATION OF ARMEN M. TASHJIAN; REQUE

11/25/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT LOGISTICARE SOLUTIONS, LLCS (UNTIMELY) MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET TWO; DECLARATION OF ARMEN M. TASHJIAN; REQUE

PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO THE DECLARATION OF JASON WU, ESQ. ATTACHED TO THE REPLY IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT BLUE CROSS' MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DOCUMEN

5/2/2018: PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO THE DECLARATION OF JASON WU, ESQ. ATTACHED TO THE REPLY IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT BLUE CROSS' MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DOCUMEN

ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

5/7/2018: ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (UNLIMITED JURISDICTION)

5/8/2018: NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (UNLIMITED JURISDICTION)

RULING

6/25/2018: RULING

Minute Order -

6/25/2018: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

7/9/2018: Minute Order -

NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL)

7/10/2018: NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL)

DEFENDANT BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER RO PLAINTIFF SHOOSHANIK CHARKUCHIAN'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/20/2018: DEFENDANT BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER RO PLAINTIFF SHOOSHANIK CHARKUCHIAN'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

PLA1NTIFF?S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF HER OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA?S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

8/27/2018: PLA1NTIFF?S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF HER OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA?S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT LOGISTICARE SOLUTIONS, LLC TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RE: REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS; ETC.

1/18/2018: OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT LOGISTICARE SOLUTIONS, LLC TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RE: REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS; ETC.

REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DR. JAMIE RIFKIN TO COMPLY WITH THE BUSINESS RECORDS SUBPOENA OF DEFENDANT LOGISTICARE SOLUTIONS, LLC

1/9/2018: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DR. JAMIE RIFKIN TO COMPLY WITH THE BUSINESS RECORDS SUBPOENA OF DEFENDANT LOGISTICARE SOLUTIONS, LLC

PROOF OF SERVICEI SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

7/18/2017: PROOF OF SERVICEI SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT LOGISTICARE SOLUTIONS, LLC'S DEMURRERS TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/27/2017: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT LOGISTICARE SOLUTIONS, LLC'S DEMURRERS TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

190 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2021
  • Hearing07/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 73 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • Hearing07/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 73 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • Hearing05/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 73 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery Responses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • Hearing04/02/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 73 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Discovery Responses to Form Interrogatories, Set Two; Requests for Sanctions (Res ID8130)) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73; Jury Trial ((7-10 days)) - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion; Filed by LogistiCare Solutions, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Kargher ISO MTC Responsese to RFP and SPROGS); Filed by LogistiCare Solutions, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by LogistiCare Solutions, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
365 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketDEFENDANT BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Shooshanik Charkhchian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Shooshanik Charkhchian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICEI SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION OF SHOOSHANIK CHARKHCHIAN, SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 377.22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Shooshanik Charkhchian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. WRONGFUL DEATH ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • DocketOpposition Document; Filed by Interested Party

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC663223    Hearing Date: March 30, 2021    Dept: 73

3/30/2021

Dept. 73

Rafael Ongkeko, Judge presiding

SHOOSHANIK CHARKHCHIAN v. BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA, et al. (BC663223)

Counsel for Plaintiff/opposing party: Armen Tashjian

Counsel for Defendant Blue Cross/moving party: Chad Fuller, Virginia Flynn, Tina Felahi, Jessica Lohr (Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP)

Other counsel: Omitted.

motion by blue cross to strike damages of complaint (filed 3/4/2021)

TENTATIVE RULING

The motion refers to matters outside the pleadings. The court denies the motion without prejudice on that narrow ground. This ruling shall not be construed to be a ruling on the substantive merits of each party’s claims. Defendant’s motion is also the subject of an alternative motion for summary adjudication to be heard on 5/25/21 apparently relying on the same authorities. In lieu of a denial, moving party may opt to continue the motion for hearing with the MSA. Finally, if Plaintiff is concerned with lack of clarity in her pleadings, Plaintiff is admonished to seek leave of court without further delay. The court expresses no opinion on the merits of such a motion.

Notice of ruling by Plaintiff.

Case Number: BC663223    Hearing Date: December 10, 2020    Dept: 73

12/10/2020

Dept. 73

Rafael Ongkeko, Judge presiding

SHOOSHANIK CHARKHCHIAN v. BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA, et al. (BC663223)

Counsel for Plaintiff/opposing party: Armen Tashjian

Counsel for Defendant LogistiCare/moving party: David Shimkin, Alexander Kargher, Yue Han (Cozen O’Connor)

Other counsel: Omitted

Motion TO COMPEL RESPONSES RE FORM INTERROGATORY 17.1 (filed 10/19/2020)

TENTATIVE RULING

None at this time. The court intends to conduct an informal discovery conference (telephonic) at 1:30 p.m. on the same day (12/10/20) in lieu of the scheduled hearing. Thereafter, if a need for a ruling remains, the court will re-set the matter. The parties need not check in until 1:30 pm.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOGISTICARE SOLUTIONS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KLINSPORT KIMBERLY A.