This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2019 at 04:50:10 (UTC).

SHOOMER LP VS MASOUD SOROUDI ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/26/2018 a Property - Commercial Eviction case was filed by SHOOMER LP against MASOUD SOROUDI in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1904

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SHOOMER LP

Respondents and Defendants

DOES 1 TO 5

SOROUDI MASOUD

SAMAN TEX INC.

 

Court Documents

RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION

8/21/2018: RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION

APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF EXECUTION, POSSESSION OR SALE

3/27/2018: APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF EXECUTION, POSSESSION OR SALE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

4/3/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE S&C

4/3/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE S&C

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

4/3/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING S&C (UD)

4/16/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING S&C (UD)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

4/16/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

4/16/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4/19/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

JUDGMENT

4/19/2018: JUDGMENT

Minute Order

4/19/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/1/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

SUMMONS

1/26/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-UNLAWFUL DETAINER

1/26/2018: COMPLAINT-UNLAWFUL DETAINER

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2018
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Shoomer, LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • Writ of Execution; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 47; (Order to Show Cause; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • Writ issued; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 47; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Partial Judgment (not entire case); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 04/03/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • Default Entered; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF EXECUTION, POSSESSION OR SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • COMPLAINT-UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Shoomer, LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

Attorney or Party without Attorney: For Court Use Only Law Offices Of: MELLER & FLOYD 2001 WILSHIRE BOULEVARD, SUITE 200SANTA MONICA, CA 90403 S ugen'or Court of California

Telephone No: 310 829-0945 FAX No: 310 829-0469 ounty of Los Angeles

Attorney for: Plaintiff

47826 APR 0 3 201

Insert name of Court, and Judicial District and Branch Court:

Los Angeles County Superior Court-Central Sheyri B, Carter, Executive Officer/Clerk

Defendant: SOROUDI

SUMMONS & COMPLAINT BC691904

1. At the time of service I was at least 18 yearsparty to this action.

TIME OF THE FILING OF THE ACTION

b. Person served: MASOUD SOROUDI -AGENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS 4. Address where the party was served.: 305 E. 9TH ST. #115

LOS ANGELES, CA 90015 3. Iserved the party: d. by other means On: Sun., Jan. 28, 2018 at: 1:48PM By Posting and First Class Mail in Accordance with CCP 415.46, and by leaving the copies with or in the Presence of:

MASOUD SOROUDI -AGENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

(1) (Business) By posting & mailing

(4) Ithereafter mailed (by first-class, postage prepaid) copies of the documents to the person to be served at the place where the copies were left (Code Civ. Proc., 415.20). I mailed the document on: Sun., Jan. 28, 2018 from: LOS ANGELES, CA

6. The "Notice to the Person Served" (on the Summons) was completed as follows: on behalf of: ALL PERSONS WHO MAY CLAIM TO OCCUPY THE PREMISES AT THE TIME OF THE FILING OF THE Other: ACTION CCP 415.46 - OCCUPANT

7. Person Who Served Papers: Recoverable Cost Per CCP 1033.5(a)(4)(B) a. ARTURO RUIZ d. The Fee for Service was: -:‘ITI. C ou ntryw i d e Pr ocess e. Iam: (3) registered California process server

1¥D

8. Ideclare under penalty of perjury under the laws of the State of California that the foregoing is true and correct. Date: Mon, Jan. 29, 2018