This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/05/2023 at 10:59:21 (UTC).

SHOHREH RASHTIAN VS SAMUEL SWAN ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/15/2017 SHOHREH RASHTIAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SAMUEL SWAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3482

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RASHTIAN SHOHREH

Defendants

SMITHS MEDICA ASD INC

VOGEL HILARY

SWAN SAMUEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ARDALAN PEZHMAN CHRISTOPHER

Defendant Attorney

MOTOOKA MARJORIE EMIKO

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

1/7/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

1/6/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

12/24/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Notice of Settlement

12/24/2019: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 12/24/2019

12/24/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 12/24/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

11/5/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER) OF 11/05/2019

11/5/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER) OF 11/05/2019

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE VIENNA NGUYEN, CSR NO. 13137

10/30/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE VIENNA NGUYEN, CSR NO. 13137

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION)

10/30/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION)

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF J. SEBAG, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION

10/22/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF J. SEBAG, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION

Memorandum - MEMORANDUM MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION

10/22/2019: Memorandum - MEMORANDUM MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION

Objection - OBJECTION EVIDENTIARY OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION

10/22/2019: Objection - OBJECTION EVIDENTIARY OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL

10/17/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SWARAJ BOSE, MD IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION

10/17/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SWARAJ BOSE, MD IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION

9/27/2019: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION

Notice of Ruling

8/19/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

8/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

Motion to Continue Trial Date

7/22/2019: Motion to Continue Trial Date

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by SHOHREH RASHTIAN on 11/15/2017, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by SHOHREH RASHTIAN as to HILARY VOGEL, SAMUEL SWAN, and SMITHS MEDICA ASD, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: SHOHREH RASHTIAN (Plaintiff); As to: SAMUEL SWAN (Defendant); HILARY VOGEL (Defendant); SMITHS MEDICA ASD, INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 07/08/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 5 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/07/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by SHOHREH RASHTIAN on 11/15/2017, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by SHOHREH RASHTIAN as to HILARY VOGEL, SAMUEL SWAN, and SMITHS MEDICA ASD, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: SHOHREH RASHTIAN (Plaintiff); As to: SAMUEL SWAN (Defendant); HILARY VOGEL (Defendant); SMITHS MEDICA ASD, INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 07/08/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Pezhman Christopher Ardalan (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Ardalan & Associates to Ardalan & Associates, PLC; Name Suffix: blank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketAddress for Pezhman Christopher Ardalan (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: notice of settlement) of 12/24/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order re: notice of settlement)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketDocument:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketDocument:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketDocument:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketDocument:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • DocketDocument:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:OSC RE Dismissal 11/16/20 at 8:30 am Benny C. Osorio

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:Jury Trial 05/15/19 at 8:30 am Benny C. Osorio

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:Final Status Conference 05/01/19 at 10:00 am Benny C. Osorio

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketDocument:Complaint Filed by: N/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketCase Filed/Opened:Motor Vehicle - PI/PD/WD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****3482    Hearing Date: October 30, 2019    Dept: 5

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

shohreh rashtian,

Plaintiff,

v.

samuel swan, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: ****3482

Hearing Date: October 30, 2019

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

Motion to compel independent medical examination

BACKGROUND

Plaintiff Shohreh Rashtian (“Plaintiff”) filed this action following a motor vehicle collision with Defendant Samuel Swan (“Defendant”). Now, Defendant seeks an order compelling Plaintiff to submit to a physical examination with Jerry Sebag, M.D. (“Dr. Sebag”). Plaintiff opposes the motion, which is granted in part and denied in part.

Legal Standard

When the physical condition of the plaintiff is in controversy in a personal injury case, the defendant may obtain a physical examination of the plaintiff. (Code Civ. Proc., ;; 2032.020, 2032.220.) A defendant is permitted to one physical examination of the plaintiff in a personal injury action on demand. (Code Civ. Proc., ; 2032.220, subd. (a).)

DISCUSSION

Plaintiff contends that she suffered a partial vitreous detachment and retinal hole as a result of the underlying accident. Accordingly, Defendant moves to compel Plaintiff to submit to an examination by Dr. Sebag, who is an ophthalmologist. Defendant is entitled to an examination. However, the proposed scope of the examination violates Code of Civil Procedure section 2032.220(a)(1), which prohibits any medical examination with “any diagnostic test or procedure that is painful, protracted, or intrusive.” (Code Civ. Proc., ; 2032.220, subd. (a)(1).)

In opposition to the motion, Plaintiff has submitted a declaration from Swaraj Bose, M.D. (“Dr. Bose”), who is an ophthalmologist and one of Plaintiff’s treating physicians. Dr. Bose states that the fundus photography that Dr. Sebag proposes to perform poses a risk of causing damage to Plaintiff’s retina. (Declaration of Swaraj Bose, M.D., ¶ 7.) Likewise, Dr. Bose states that the fluorescein angiography would require Plaintiff to undergo injections which may damage to her retina. (Id., ¶ 8.) Dr. Bose further states that the AVISO ultrasound that Dr. Sebag proposes to perform is not FDA approved and can cause cavitation in the tissue, with unknown long-term impacts. (Id., ¶ 9.) Finally, Dr. Bose states that the OPTOS/SLO is not FDA approved, and is not a standard diagnostic device for Plaintiff’s injuries. (Id., ¶ 10.) Plaintiff also relies on the deposition testimony of Dr. Galareh Dana (“Dr. Dana”), formerly known as Dr. Galareh Abedi, another of Plaintiff’s treating physicians. Dr. Dana recommends against any testing that is not medically necessary due to Plaintiff’s condition and corroborates Dr. Bose’s view that certain tests may harm Plaintiff. (Declaration of P. Christopher Ardalan, Exh. #3, at pp. 52-56.

In support of his reply brief, Defendant proffers a declaration from Dr. Bose stating: (1) Fundus photography does not involve intense light exposure and will not damage Plaintiff’s eyes; (2) Flourescein angiography “is a routine test performed on a daily basis” and has “excellent safety and efficacy;” (3) AVISO ultrasound is FDA approved and has “excellent safety and efficacy;” and (4) the OPTOS/SLO takes two minutes per eye and only requires Plaintiff to click a button when she sees a light. (Declaration of Jerry Sebag, ¶¶ 5-8.)

Plaintiff has satisfied her burden of establishing that certain tests are prohibited under section 2032.220(a)(1). Not only does Plaintiff proffer two ophthalmologists, neither is a retained expert relying on Plaintiff’s counsel for future business. Both believe there is some risk of harm, and Dr. Sebag’s declaration does not provide comfort because it does not eliminate this possibility. Therefore, Defendant’s motion is denied without prejudice to Defendant re-noticing a medical examination without any tests that violate section 2032.220(a)(1).

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

Defendant’s motion is granted in part and denied in part. Defendant is entitled to a medical examination of Plaintiff, which shall occur within thirty (30) days of notice. However, Defendant is not entitled to conduct any test that is painful or risks further harm to Plaintiff, per Code of Civil Procedure section 2032.220(a)(1). Nor may Defendant conduct any test that is not approved by the FDA. Specifically, the examination may not include fundus photograph, fluorescein angiography, an AVISO ultrasound, or the OPTOS/SLO test. Defendant shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: October 30, 2019 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court