This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/27/2021 at 12:36:51 (UTC).

SHLOMO Y RECHNITZ VS JASON LYONS ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/07/2018 SHLOMO Y RECHNITZ filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against JASON LYONS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PATRICIA D. NIETO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7173

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PATRICIA D. NIETO

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

RECHNITZ SHLOMO

NATIONAL SOCIETY OF HEBREW DAYS A CHARITABLE ORGANIZATION

NATIONAL SOCIETY OF HEBREW DAYS

Respondents and Defendants

HOGEG MOSHE

LYONS JASON

MOBLI MEDIA INC.

DOES 1-100

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

GLASER PATRICIA L. ESQ.

GLASER WEIL FINK HOWARD AVCHEN SHAPIRO

SHAPIRO GLASER WEIL FINK HOWARD AVCHEN

GLASER PATRICIA L

JOHNSON MARK ANDERS

NORRIS DONALD GEORGE

Defendant Attorneys

GREENSPOON MARDER LLP

HANDAL ANTON N

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE

9/4/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

6/27/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

4/10/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

6/28/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF RORY S. MILLER

5/3/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF RORY S. MILLER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES)

5/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES)

Proof of Service -

8/7/2018: Proof of Service -

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/16/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

STIPULATION AND JOINT MOTION REGARDING EXTENSION OF DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT JASON LYONS TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT ORDER

6/1/2018: STIPULATION AND JOINT MOTION REGARDING EXTENSION OF DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT JASON LYONS TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT ORDER

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT JASON LYONS WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND FOR THE COURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON

11/4/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT JASON LYONS WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND FOR THE COURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

11/5/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DONALD NORRIS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM ORDER TO DISMISS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 473(B)

11/25/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DONALD NORRIS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM ORDER TO DISMISS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 473(B)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SANSAN LIN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM ORDER TO DISMISS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 473(B)

11/25/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SANSAN LIN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM ORDER TO DISMISS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 473(B)

Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal

11/25/2020: Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DISMISSAL (CCP 473))

1/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DISMISSAL (CCP 473))

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

1/8/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/8/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION

1/8/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION

69 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by Shlomo Rechnitz (Plaintiff); National Society of Hebrew Days (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Order to Show Cause Re: (Default/Default Judgment) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketOrder (GRANTING PLAINTIFF?S APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT); Filed by Shlomo Rechnitz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Order to Show Cause Re: (Default/Default Judgment) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Default/Default Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Shlomo Rechnitz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketResponse (PLAINTIFF?S RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND SUBMISSION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT); Filed by Shlomo Rechnitz (Plaintiff); National Society of Hebrew Days (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF SANSAN LIN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND SUBMISSION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT); Filed by Shlomo Rechnitz (Plaintiff); National Society of Hebrew Days (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by National Society of Hebrew Days (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
108 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Shlomo Rechnitz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Shlomo Rechnitz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Shlomo Rechnitz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF FLORIDA SECURITIES REGISTRATION STATUTE ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

PATRICIA L. GLASER - State Bar No. 55668

pglaser@glaserweil.com

GLASER WEIL FINK HOWARD

AVCHEN & SHAPIRO LLP FILED e 10250 Constellation Boulevard, 19t Floor Sugator COL's Angeles Los Angeles, California 90067 ounty

Telephone: (310) 553-3000 MAR -7 2018

Facsimile: (310) 556-2920 ) . utive Ofticer/Cler Attorneys for Plaintiff SHLOMO Y. RECHNITZ cherri R. Cafi!r{, f’;e@i’) Deputy

By ancy Alvarez

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

SHLOMO Y. RECHNITZ, an Individual Case No.:

Plaintiff, BC697173

COMPLAINT FOR:

1. BREACH OF FLORIDA SECURITIES

REGISTRATION STATUTE

JASON LYONS, an Individual, MOSHE HOGEG, an Individual, MOBLI MEDIA, INC., | 2. SECURITIES FRAUD and DOES 1 THROUGH 100, 3. CONTROL PERSON LIABILITY Defendants. 4. COMMON LAW FRAUD

5. BREACH OF CALIFORNIA

BROKER-DEALER REGISTRATION STATUTE

6. NEGLIGENT

MISREPRESENTATION

7. UNJUST

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anton Nasri Handal