This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/06/2019 at 01:44:54 (UTC).

SHLOMIT COHEN VS SINANIAN DEVELOPMENT INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/16/2018 SHLOMIT COHEN filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SINANIAN DEVELOPMENT INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BARBARA A. MEIERS and RITA MILLER. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4534

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BARBARA A. MEIERS

RITA MILLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COHEN SHLOMIT

Defendants

RESIDENCES AT VILLAGE WALK LP

SINANIAN DEVELOPMENT INC

BROWN CENTER THE VILLAGE AT TARZANA LP

RESIDENCES AT VILLAGE WALK LLC

SINANIAN ANTRANIK

SINANIAN SINAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

SILVERBERG ROBERT ESQ.

AVANESOV IVETTA

HAINES JAMES WALTER

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

HERZOG JULIE A. ESQ.

HERZOG JULIE ANN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

3/18/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement

2/4/2019: Notice of Settlement

Case Management Statement

1/3/2019: Case Management Statement

Stipulation and Order

1/7/2019: Stipulation and Order

Minute Order

1/7/2019: Minute Order

COMPLAINT

2/16/2018: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS

2/16/2018: SUMMONS

Notice of Continuance

10/10/2018: Notice of Continuance

Complaint

10/31/2018: Complaint

Minute Order

11/14/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

9/4/2018: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

6/11/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

6/20/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Minute Order

6/21/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

7/24/2018: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4/5/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF DEMURRERS AND DEMURRERS OF DEFENDANTS SINANIAN DEVLOPMENT, INC., RESIDENCES AT VTLLAG WALK. L.P., RESIDENCES AT VILLAGE WALK, LLC, SINAN SINANIAN AND ANTRANK SINANIAN

3/27/2018: NOTICE OF DEMURRERS AND DEMURRERS OF DEFENDANTS SINANIAN DEVLOPMENT, INC., RESIDENCES AT VTLLAG WALK. L.P., RESIDENCES AT VILLAGE WALK, LLC, SINAN SINANIAN AND ANTRANK SINANIAN

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/12/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 16; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Docketat 09:02 AM in Department 16; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Shlomit Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Shlomit Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Shlomit Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (To Permit Filing Of Second Amended Complaint); Filed by Shlomit Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ((Post-Mediation Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketPetition; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketPetition; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketPetition; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketPetition; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketPetition; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Shlomit Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketPEREMPTORY CHALLENGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Shlomit Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

ORIGINAL

For Court Use Only

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RESIDENCES AT VILLAGE WALK LP is a litigant

Latest cases where SINANIAN DEVELOPMENT INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HERZOG JULIE ANN