This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2019 at 03:55:26 (UTC).

SHIRLEY BROOKS VS INGLEWOOD OPERATING COMPANY LP ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/08/2017 SHIRLEY BROOKS filed a Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse lawsuit against INGLEWOOD OPERATING COMPANY LP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2777

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

BROOKS SHIRLEY

Respondents and Defendants

AREVALO ARMANDO

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

INGLEWOOD HEALTH CARE CENTER

MARINER HEALTHCARE INC.

INGLEWOOD OPERATING COMPANY LP

Guardian Ad Litem

WILLIAMS YVETTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF STEWART LEVIN

LEVIN STEWART JEFFREY

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

ROSS DARRYL A.

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

2/22/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

DECLARATION OF STEWART LEVIN WITH RESPECTTO STATUS ON SERVICE OF THIS CASE AND OSC RE: SANCTIONS

2/27/2018: DECLARATION OF STEWART LEVIN WITH RESPECTTO STATUS ON SERVICE OF THIS CASE AND OSC RE: SANCTIONS

Unknown

2/28/2018: Unknown

SUMMONS

3/1/2018: SUMMONS

Minute Order

3/2/2018: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/12/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/14/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/19/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/19/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Unknown

5/1/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

5/8/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

5/24/2018: Unknown

STIPULATTON TO SUBMIT ALL CLAIMS TO BINDING ARBITRATION AND ORDER

5/24/2018: STIPULATTON TO SUBMIT ALL CLAIMS TO BINDING ARBITRATION AND ORDER

Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person with a Disability (Miscellaneous)

10/10/2018: Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person with a Disability (Miscellaneous)

Motion for Order

12/4/2018: Motion for Order

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous)

12/4/2018: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous)

Minute Order

12/4/2018: Minute Order

Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

12/4/2018: Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account; Filed by Yvette Williams (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 49; Status Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Status Conference regarding Arbitration)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Docketat 08:35 AM in Department 49; Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketMotion for Order (RULING); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous); Filed by Shirley Brooks (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketOrder to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketExpedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person with a Disability (Miscellaneous); Filed by Shirley Brooks (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 49; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Vacated) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketOSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketOSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Shirley Brooks (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. ELDER ABUSE; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****2777    Hearing Date: July 22, 2020    Dept: 49

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Shirley Brooks,

Plaintiff,

Case No.

****2777

v.

[Tentative] Ruling

Inglewood Operating Company LP., et al.,

Defendants.

Hearing Date: July 22, 2020

Department 49, Judge Stuart M. Rice

(1) Petition for Withdrawal of Funds from Blocked Account

Moving Party:  Petitioner Yvette Williams

Responding Party:      none

Ruling: The petition to withdraw funds is granted. The proposed order will be signed and filed.   

Petitioner Yvette Williams requests an order permitting the withdrawal of the $5,080.42 remaining in deceased plaintiff Shirley Brooks’s account, $500 of which is to be distributed to attorney Stewart Levin, with the remaining $4,580.42 going to Williams. There is no opposition. The petition is granted.

Date: July 22, 2020

Honorable Stuart M. Rice

Judge of the Superior Court



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INGLEWOOD HEALTH CARE CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where INGLEWOOD OPERATING COMPANY LP A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP AKA INGLEWOOD HEALTH CARE CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where MARINER HEALTH CARE MANAGEMENT COMPANY A DELAWARE CORPORATION DBA SANTA MONICA HEALTH CARE CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSS DARRYL A.