Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/03/2020 at 01:02:34 (UTC).

SHILPA RAJPARA VS NINE ZERO EIGHT AND NINE TWELVE SIXTH STREET HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 03/19/2019 SHILPA RAJPARA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NINE ZERO EIGHT AND NINE TWELVE SIXTH STREET HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MALCOLM MACKEY. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9426

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MALCOLM MACKEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAJPARA SHILPA

Defendant

NINE ZERO EIGHT AND NINE TWELVE SIXTH STREET HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KHOSHLESAN JOSEPH

Defendant Attorney

KALTENBACH JOHN JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/30/2020

3/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/30/2020

Request for Dismissal

4/3/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/18/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

5/20/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/28/2019: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

4/4/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

4/12/2019: Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Notice of Deposit - Jury

4/12/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/22/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint

3/19/2019: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/19/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/20/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Shilpa Rajpara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • Docketat 3:50 PM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/30/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Shilpa Rajpara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Nine Zero Eight and Nine Twelve Sixth Street Homeowners Association (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketAnswer (to Complaint); Filed by Nine Zero Eight and Nine Twelve Sixth Street Homeowners Association (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Nine Zero Eight and Nine Twelve Sixth Street Homeowners Association (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Shilpa Rajpara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Shilpa Rajpara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Shilpa Rajpara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Shilpa Rajpara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KALTENBACH JOHN J. ESQ.