This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2022 at 20:01:09 (UTC).

SHIFRA WYLDER VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/04/2022 SHIFRA WYLDER filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4935

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WYLDER SHIFRA

Defendants

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHARLIN STEPHANIE ELYSE

Defendant Attorney

HUESTON JOHN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/5/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/4/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/4/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/4/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/4/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/4/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/4/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Complaint

5/4/2022: Complaint

Unknown - NOTICE RE: ADD-ON PETITION NOTICE OF SUBMISSION RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONALS PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

6/6/2022: Unknown - NOTICE RE: ADD-ON PETITION NOTICE OF SUBMISSION RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONALS PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Proof of Service by Mail

5/26/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

5/26/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Unknown - DECLARATION OF CRAIG A. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

5/17/2022: Unknown - DECLARATION OF CRAIG A. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

5/17/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP) - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

5/17/2022: Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP) - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2022
  • Hearing09/07/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketNotice Re: Add-On Petition (NOTICE OF SUBMISSION RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL?S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE); Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Shifra Wylder (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Shifra Wylder (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Craig A. Fligor in Support of Southern California Edison Company and Edison International's Petition to Coordinate Add-on Case; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketProof of Service Re: Southern California Edison Company and Edison International's Petition to Coordinate Add-on Case; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketSouthern California Edison Company and Edison International's Petition to Coordinate Add-on Case [JCCP5000]; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Shifra Wylder (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Shifra Wylder (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Shifra Wylder (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Shifra Wylder (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EDISON INTERNATIONAL is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHARLIN STEPHANIE ELYSE