This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/26/2021 at 23:48:50 (UTC).

SHERRY M. WINTERS, ET AL. VS AARON JASON MENSCH, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/08/2021 SHERRY M WINTERS filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against AARON JASON MENSCH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1643

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SHERRY M. WINTERS AS TRUSTEE OF THE SHERRY WINTERS LIVING TRUST

SHERRY M. WINTERS TRUSTEE OF THE ALLEN AND CHARLOTTE RABIN FAMILY TRUST FBO GREG WINTERS U.T.A

SHERRY M. WINTERS TRUSTEE OF THE ALLEN AND CHARLOTTE RABIN FAMILY TRUST FBO LAUREN WINTERS U.T.A

SHERRY M. WINTERS TRUSTEE OF THE ALLEN AND CHARLOTTE RABIN FAMILY TRUST FBO SHERRY M. WINTERS U.T.A.

WINTERS SHERRY M.

Defendants

BARRINGTON CAPITAL GROUP LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

BCG HELMS HOMES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

BCG MGMT LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

FIRST REPUBLIC BANK A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

FORWARD CALABASES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

LEISHMAN BRYAN NICHOLAS

MENSCH AARON JASON

YELLOWSTONE INVESTMENT LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COHEN LOREN NATHAN

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Mail

10/28/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Personal Service

10/28/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/28/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration re: Due Diligence

10/28/2021: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Declaration re: Due Diligence

10/28/2021: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Proof of Personal Service

10/28/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/28/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration re: Due Diligence

10/28/2021: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Proof of Service by Mail

10/28/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

10/28/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/28/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/28/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/28/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/28/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration - DECLARATION OF KELSEY MILLS RE: GOOD FAITH ATTEMPT TO MEET AND CONFER PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 430.41(A)(2)

11/16/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF KELSEY MILLS RE: GOOD FAITH ATTEMPT TO MEET AND CONFER PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 430.41(A)(2)

Notice of Lis Pendens

11/17/2021: Notice of Lis Pendens

Notice - RECORDED NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION (C.C.P. 405.20)

11/18/2021: Notice - RECORDED NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION (C.C.P. 405.20)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

11/23/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2022
  • Hearing04/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Expunge Lis Pendens) - Held - Advanced and Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • Docketat 1:36 PM in Department O; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Ruling, Without a Hearing or Further Argument, on Ex P...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Aaron Jason Mensch (Defendant); Bryan Nicholas Leishman (Defendant); BARRINGTON CAPITAL GROUP, LLC a California limited liability company (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by Aaron Jason Mensch (Defendant); Bryan Nicholas Leishman (Defendant); BARRINGTON CAPITAL GROUP, LLC a California limited liability company (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Application (to Expunge Lis Pendens); Filed by Aaron Jason Mensch (Defendant); Bryan Nicholas Leishman (Defendant); BARRINGTON CAPITAL GROUP, LLC a California limited liability company (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketRECORDED NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION (C.C.P. 405.20); Filed by Sherry M. Winters (Plaintiff); SHERRY M. WINTERS, as Trustee of the Sherry Winters Living Trust dated June 24, 1998 (Plaintiff); SHERRY M. WINTERS, Trustee of the Allen and Charlotte Rabin Family Trust FBO Sherry M. Winters u.t.a. 6/20/1980 (Plaintiff) et

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Sherry M. Winters (Plaintiff); SHERRY M. WINTERS, as Trustee of the Sherry Winters Living Trust dated June 24, 1998 (Plaintiff); SHERRY M. WINTERS, Trustee of the Allen and Charlotte Rabin Family Trust FBO Sherry M. Winters u.t.a. 6/20/1980 (Plaintiff) et

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Sherry M. Winters (Plaintiff); SHERRY M. WINTERS, as Trustee of the Sherry Winters Living Trust dated June 24, 1998 (Plaintiff); SHERRY M. WINTERS, Trustee of the Allen and Charlotte Rabin Family Trust FBO Sherry M. Winters u.t.a. 6/20/1980 (Plaintiff) et

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Sherry M. Winters (Plaintiff); SHERRY M. WINTERS, as Trustee of the Sherry Winters Living Trust dated June 24, 1998 (Plaintiff); SHERRY M. WINTERS, Trustee of the Allen and Charlotte Rabin Family Trust FBO Sherry M. Winters u.t.a. 6/20/1980 (Plaintiff) et

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Sherry M. Winters (Plaintiff); SHERRY M. WINTERS, as Trustee of the Sherry Winters Living Trust dated June 24, 1998 (Plaintiff); SHERRY M. WINTERS, Trustee of the Allen and Charlotte Rabin Family Trust FBO Sherry M. Winters u.t.a. 6/20/1980 (Plaintiff) et

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Sherry M. Winters (Plaintiff); SHERRY M. WINTERS, as Trustee of the Sherry Winters Living Trust dated June 24, 1998 (Plaintiff); SHERRY M. WINTERS, Trustee of the Allen and Charlotte Rabin Family Trust FBO Sherry M. Winters u.t.a. 6/20/1980 (Plaintiff) et

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Sherry M. Winters (Plaintiff); SHERRY M. WINTERS, as Trustee of the Sherry Winters Living Trust dated June 24, 1998 (Plaintiff); SHERRY M. WINTERS, Trustee of the Allen and Charlotte Rabin Family Trust FBO Sherry M. Winters u.t.a. 6/20/1980 (Plaintiff) et

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sherry M. Winters (Plaintiff); SHERRY M. WINTERS, as Trustee of the Sherry Winters Living Trust dated June 24, 1998 (Plaintiff); SHERRY M. WINTERS, Trustee of the Allen and Charlotte Rabin Family Trust FBO Sherry M. Winters u.t.a. 6/20/1980 (Plaintiff) et

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sherry M. Winters (Plaintiff); SHERRY M. WINTERS, as Trustee of the Sherry Winters Living Trust dated June 24, 1998 (Plaintiff); SHERRY M. WINTERS, Trustee of the Allen and Charlotte Rabin Family Trust FBO Sherry M. Winters u.t.a. 6/20/1980 (Plaintiff) et

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sherry M. Winters (Plaintiff); SHERRY M. WINTERS, as Trustee of the Sherry Winters Living Trust dated June 24, 1998 (Plaintiff); SHERRY M. WINTERS, Trustee of the Allen and Charlotte Rabin Family Trust FBO Sherry M. Winters u.t.a. 6/20/1980 (Plaintiff) et

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FORWARD CALABASAS INC. CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where FIRST REPUBLIC BANK, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COHEN LOREN N.