This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/24/2023 at 14:04:23 (UTC).

SHERRY EWALD, ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 SHERRY EWALD, filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III and WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0567

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ASPRON ALEXANDRA

BAKALOR BARRY MELVIN

BAKALOR SUE ELLEN

EWALD SHERRY

HILBURGER DEREK

LADESICH JOSEPH CHARLES

LADESICH LUCAS

LADESICH ROBERT

POLK STEPHEN

SANDOVAL MARIEL

SILVERMAN CLARA

SILVERMAN JACK

STARK JUDD PHILLIP

WALKER JEREMY MICHAEL

WILBUR DAVID

LADESICH JOSEPH CHARLES [TRUSTEE]

POLK STEPHEN [TRUSTEE]

Defendants

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHALEN DANIEL C.

Defendant Attorney

HUESTON JOHN C

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/22/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

6/30/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

5/26/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/24/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Unknown - NOTICE OF ORDER RE: PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE

3/30/2023: Unknown - NOTICE OF ORDER RE: PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

3/30/2023: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/30/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE

3/24/2023: Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE

Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE

3/24/2023: Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE

Notice of Submission of Petition for Coordination - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONALS PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

3/15/2023: Notice of Submission of Petition for Coordination - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONALS PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP) - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONALS PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

3/13/2023: Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP) - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONALS PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Unknown - DECLARATION OF CRAIG A. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONALS PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

3/13/2023: Unknown - DECLARATION OF CRAIG A. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONALS PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONALS PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

3/13/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONALS PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

3/10/2023: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

3/10/2023: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

2/5/2023: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

2/3/2023: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (STELLA BELLE SANDOVAL)

1/31/2023: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (STELLA BELLE SANDOVAL)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Further Status Conference scheduled for 08/21/2023 at 02:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 10 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 08/22/2023 01:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Mariel Sandoval, [GAL for Stella Sandoval] (Plaintiff): Name Suffix: [GAL for Stella Sandoval]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- [Proposed] Order Re: Petition for Coordination of Add-On Case: As To Parties changed from David Wilbur (Plaintiff) to David Wilbur (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketNotice of Order Re: Petition for Coordination of Add-On Case; Filed by: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant); JCCP Number: JCCP5000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 10 - Hon. William F. Highberger; Reason: Deemed Complex (Non-Class Action)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Sherry Ewald (Plaintiff); Joseph Charles Ladesich (Plaintiff); Robert Ladesich (Plaintiff); Nicholas Ladesich (Plaintiff); Alexandra Aspron (Plaintiff); Lucas Ladesich (Plaintiff); Judd Phillip Stark (Plaintiff); Jeremy Michael Walker (Plaintiff); Barry Melvin Bakalor (Plaintiff); Sue Ellen Bakalor (Plaintiff); Derek Hilburger (Plaintiff); David Wilbur (Plaintiff); Stephen Polk (Plaintiff); Jack Silverman (Plaintiff); Clara Silverman (Plaintiff); Mariel Sandoval (Plaintiff); Stella Sandoval (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Sherry Ewald (Plaintiff); Joseph Charles Ladesich (Plaintiff); Robert Ladesich (Plaintiff); Nicholas Ladesich (Plaintiff); Alexandra Aspron (Plaintiff); Lucas Ladesich (Plaintiff); Judd Phillip Stark (Plaintiff); Jeremy Michael Walker (Plaintiff); Barry Melvin Bakalor (Plaintiff); Sue Ellen Bakalor (Plaintiff); Derek Hilburger (Plaintiff); David Wilbur (Plaintiff); Stephen Polk (Plaintiff); Jack Silverman (Plaintiff); Clara Silverman (Plaintiff); Mariel Sandoval (Plaintiff); Stella Sandoval (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCase assigned in Department 11 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less