This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/01/2023 at 17:47:42 (UTC).

SHERRY EWALD, ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 SHERRY EWALD, filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0567

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ASPRON ALEXANDRA

BAKALOR BARRY MELVIN

BAKALOR SUE ELLEN

EWALD SHERRY

HILBURGER DEREK

LADESICH JOSEPH CHARLES

LADESICH LUCAS

LADESICH NICHOLAS

LADESICH ROBERT

POLK STEPHEN

SANDOVAL MARIEL

SILVERMAN CLARA

SILVERMAN JACK

STARK JUDD PHILLIP

WALKER JEREMY MICHAEL

WILBUR DAVID

Defendants

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHALEN DANIEL C.

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/11/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

1/11/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/11/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/11/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/11/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

1/19/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 01/19/2023

1/19/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 01/19/2023

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION

1/31/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of 01/19/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 10 - Hon. William F. Highberger; Reason: Deemed Complex (Non-Class Action)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Sherry Ewald (Plaintiff); Joseph Charles Ladesich (Plaintiff); Robert Ladesich (Plaintiff); Nicholas Ladesich (Plaintiff); Alexandra Aspron (Plaintiff); Lucas Ladesich (Plaintiff); Judd Phillip Stark (Plaintiff); Jeremy Michael Walker (Plaintiff); Barry Melvin Bakalor (Plaintiff); Sue Ellen Bakalor (Plaintiff); Derek Hilburger (Plaintiff); David Wilbur (Plaintiff); Stephen Polk (Plaintiff); Jack Silverman (Plaintiff); Clara Silverman (Plaintiff); Mariel Sandoval (Plaintiff); Stella Sandoval (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Sherry Ewald (Plaintiff); Joseph Charles Ladesich (Plaintiff); Robert Ladesich (Plaintiff); Nicholas Ladesich (Plaintiff); Alexandra Aspron (Plaintiff); Lucas Ladesich (Plaintiff); Judd Phillip Stark (Plaintiff); Jeremy Michael Walker (Plaintiff); Barry Melvin Bakalor (Plaintiff); Sue Ellen Bakalor (Plaintiff); Derek Hilburger (Plaintiff); David Wilbur (Plaintiff); Stephen Polk (Plaintiff); Jack Silverman (Plaintiff); Clara Silverman (Plaintiff); Mariel Sandoval (Plaintiff); Stella Sandoval (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCase assigned in Department 11 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less