This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/27/2022 at 09:29:46 (UTC).

SHERRILYN SMITH, ET AL. VS BENNIE ROSBOROUGH, III, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/01/2021 SHERRILYN SMITH filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BENNIE ROSBOROUGH, III. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3926

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ESTATE OF LEONARD TAYLOR SMITH THROUGH ITS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST SHERRILYN SMITH

SMITH SHERRILYN

Defendants

LEWIS JAPORSCHA

MATTHEWS CARRIE

MAYRA'S DRIVE THRU MINI MARKET

MEK LONG BEACH LLC

REGENCY OAKS POST ACUTE CARE CENTER

ROSBOROUGH BENNIE III

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EASTON W. DOUGLAS

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/1/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

12/14/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

12/14/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2024
  • Hearing11/27/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • Hearing05/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • Hearing05/17/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sherrilyn Smith (Plaintiff); ESTATE OF LEONARD TAYLOR SMITH, through its Successor-In-Interest, SHERRILYN SMITH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sherrilyn Smith (Plaintiff); ESTATE OF LEONARD TAYLOR SMITH, through its Successor-In-Interest, SHERRILYN SMITH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sherrilyn Smith (Plaintiff); ESTATE OF LEONARD TAYLOR SMITH, through its Successor-In-Interest, SHERRILYN SMITH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEK LONG BEACH LLC DBA REGENCY OAKS POST ACUTE CARE CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EASTON W. DOUGLAS