This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/07/2023 at 20:19:38 (UTC).

SHERRI ELIZABETH FAGAN VS UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 SHERRI ELIZABETH FAGAN filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1899

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FAGAN SHERRI ELIZABETH

Defendants

WIPFLI RALPH

UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIPELES KEVIN A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2023
  • Hearing06/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • Hearing06/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Sherri Elizabeth Fagan (Plaintiff); As to: Ralph Wipfli (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/02/2023; Service Cost: 64.90; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Sherri Elizabeth Fagan (Plaintiff); As to: University Of Southern California (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/22/2023; Service Cost: 64.90; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 74

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- University Of Southern California (Defendant): Organization Name changed from University Of Southern California, a California corporation to University Of Southern California

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketAddress for Kevin A. Lipeles (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 74

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Sherri Elizabeth Fagan (Plaintiff); As to: University Of Southern California, a California corporation (Defendant); Ralph Wipfli (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Sherri Elizabeth Fagan (Plaintiff); As to: University Of Southern California, a California corporation (Defendant); Ralph Wipfli (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Sherri Elizabeth Fagan (Plaintiff); As to: University Of Southern California, a California corporation (Defendant); Ralph Wipfli (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Colin P. Leis in Department 74 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less