This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2021 at 18:43:23 (UTC).

SHERMAN, MAX RONALD - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 05/10/2021 SHERMAN, MAX RONALD - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BOGDANOFF, LEE R.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4561

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BOGDANOFF, LEE R.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

SHERMAN JASAN HOWARD

SHERMAN YOLA

Decedent

SHERMAN MAX RONALD

Not Classified By Court

FINCH MARY ARLENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

PARR JORDAN C.

ADLER ERIC ROBERT

AGRAN MICHAEL CHARLES

 

Court Documents

Will in Safekeeping - Holo 2 pgs - Dated - 05/25/2001 - 21STSK01880

8/11/2021: Will in Safekeeping - Holo 2 pgs - Dated - 05/25/2001 - 21STSK01880

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

8/12/2021: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Proof of Service

8/12/2021: Proof of Service

Petition - Probate of Will (Subsequent)

8/11/2021: Petition - Probate of Will (Subsequent)

Declaration

8/11/2021: Declaration

Order - Appointing Personal Representative

7/13/2021: Order - Appointing Personal Representative

Response - Response to Objections

6/24/2021: Response - Response to Objections

Objection - Subsequent Petition Decedent's Estate - Objection - Subsequent Petition Decedent's Estate

6/24/2021: Objection - Subsequent Petition Decedent's Estate - Objection - Subsequent Petition Decedent's Estate

Supplement

6/25/2021: Supplement

Supplement

6/28/2021: Supplement

Reply - Reply to Response

6/28/2021: Reply - Reply to Response

Minute Order

6/29/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/29/2021: Minute Order

Notice - Related Cases - 21STPB05357

6/29/2021: Notice - Related Cases - 21STPB05357

Declaration

7/7/2021: Declaration

Objection - Appointment of Personal Representative

6/14/2021: Objection - Appointment of Personal Representative

Notice - Notice of Association of Counsel

6/16/2021: Notice - Notice of Association of Counsel

Notice - Continuance

6/22/2021: Notice - Continuance

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2022
  • Hearing11/18/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 29 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • Hearing10/01/2021 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 29 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketWill in Safekeeping (Holo 2 pgs - Dated - 05/25/2001 - 21STSK01880 ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketPetition - Probate of Will (Subsequent); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Personal Representative; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/04/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid V; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketWithdrawal (Notice of Withdrawal of Ex Parte ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Urgency ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEx Parte - Petition ($200.00) ([Appearing 05/12/2021] Ex Parte Petition for Letters of Special Administration ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration re Notice ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer AGRAN MICHAEL CHARLES

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARR JORDAN C.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADLER ERIC ROBERT