This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2022 at 00:46:23 (UTC).

SHERICE NORRIS VS LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/21/2022 SHERICE NORRIS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRUCE G. IWASAKI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0318

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BRUCE G. IWASAKI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORRIS SHERICE

Defendants

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT A PUBLIC ENTITY

THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE CALIFORNIA STATE UNIVERSITY A PUBLIC ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARLIN GARY R.

Defendant Attorneys

SHAHIN NARMIN

KANOONI KEVIN

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/22/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

6/21/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

6/21/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/21/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/21/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6/21/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Complaint

6/21/2022: Complaint

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

6/28/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/28/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

6/27/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

7/22/2022: Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

8/9/2022: Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/4/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

8/4/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/04/2022

8/4/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/04/2022

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

8/3/2022: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2022
  • Hearing10/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 78 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Demurring Party in Support of Automatic Extension; Filed by THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE CALIFORNIA STATE UNIVERSITY, a public entity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • Docketat 08:05 AM in Department 58, Bruce G. Iwasaki, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/04/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, a public entity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Demurring Party in Support of Automatic Extension; Filed by LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, a public entity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by SHERICE NORRIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SHERICE NORRIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SHERICE NORRIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SHERICE NORRIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARLIN GARY R