Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/16/2021 at 19:27:25 (UTC).

SHERALYN LEWIS VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 03/16/2021 SHERALYN LEWIS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0219

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEWIS SHERALYN

Defendants

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITE TWILA S.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

3/22/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/22/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/16/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2021
  • Hearing06/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Sheralyn Lewis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sheralyn Lewis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sheralyn Lewis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sheralyn Lewis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WHITE TWILA S