Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/29/2021 at 16:45:08 (UTC).

SHENOUDA, GEORGE VS PAGDANGANAN, ROSALET

Case Summary

On 05/07/2019 SHENOUDA, GEORGE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PAGDANGANAN, ROSALET. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SHORT, MICHELLE, RIFF, LAWRENCE P., MACKENZIE, ALISON, SAXMAN, RON and BREDDAN, MATTHEW A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0847

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SHORT, MICHELLE

RIFF, LAWRENCE P.

MACKENZIE, ALISON

SAXMAN, RON

BREDDAN, MATTHEW A

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SHENOUDA GEORGE

Respondent

PAGDANGANAN ROSALET

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MORRIS MATTHEW LEVI

Respondent Attorney

MOSQUEDA ROMAN P

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

2/16/2021: Minute Order

Declaration - Income and Expense

1/5/2021: Declaration - Income and Expense

Minute Order

11/16/2020: Minute Order

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

5/7/2019: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Notice - Case Assignment

5/7/2019: Notice - Case Assignment

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - GRANTED

5/10/2019: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - GRANTED

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

5/10/2019: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (w/in Existing Case)

5/10/2019: Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (w/in Existing Case)

Proof of Service - DV109, DV110, DV120

5/17/2019: Proof of Service - DV109, DV110, DV120

Memorandum - Points and Authorities

5/29/2019: Memorandum - Points and Authorities

Declaration - Of Wagdy Shenouda

5/29/2019: Declaration - Of Wagdy Shenouda

Nunc Pro Tunc Minute Order

5/31/2019: Nunc Pro Tunc Minute Order

Minute Order

5/31/2019: Minute Order

FL_General Family Law - FL - Notice - Trial Setting Conference

9/24/2019: FL_General Family Law - FL - Notice - Trial Setting Conference

FL_General Family Law - FL - Rejection - Trial/Default

10/1/2019: FL_General Family Law - FL - Rejection - Trial/Default

Minute Order

12/2/2019: Minute Order

Substitution of Attorney - Atty Matthew L. Morris Sub In

1/27/2020: Substitution of Attorney - Atty Matthew L. Morris Sub In

Notice - Continuance

4/29/2020: Notice - Continuance

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2021
  • Hearing07/06/2021 at 8:30 AM in Department F48 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause re: Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department F48, Short, Michelle, Presiding; Order to Show Cause re: Entry of Judgment - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2020
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department F48, Short, Michelle, Presiding; Mandatory Settlement Conference - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (w/in Existing Case); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109) (GRANTED ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORRIS MATTHEW LEVI