Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/29/2021 at 02:04:45 (UTC).

SHENG PAN VS CTBC BANK CORPORATION (USA), ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/28/2020 SHENG PAN filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against CTBC BANK CORPORATION USA . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9350

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAN SHENG

Defendants

LIANG JINLIANG

CTBC BANK CORPORATION USA

XU SHAOWEI

DYNAMIC BRIDGE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITE KENNETH PAUL

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/10/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/12/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/12/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/27/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/30/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint

12/28/2020: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/28/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/28/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction

12/28/2020: Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Sheng Pan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Sheng Pan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sheng Pan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sheng Pan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sheng Pan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketClerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHINATRUST BANK (USA) is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WHITE KENNETH PAUL