This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/17/2023 at 14:46:17 (UTC).

SHEMEKA JORDAN, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL. VS WALTER FERNANDO MOYA, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/09/2020 SHEMEKA JORDAN, AN INDIVIDUAL, filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against WALTER FERNANDO MOYA, AN INDIVIDUAL,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROLF M. TREU, SERENA R. MURILLO and MARK E. WINDHAM. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9008

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROLF M. TREU

SERENA R. MURILLO

MARK E. WINDHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JONES AN INDIVIDUAL JOSHUANAY

JORDAN AN INDIVIDUAL SHEMEKA

Defendants

ROCKVIEW DAIRIES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MOYA AN INDIVIDUAL WALTER FERNANDO

CATERER'S LEASING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ROCKVIEW FARMS UNKNOWN ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AZIZI DANIEL ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Motion for Reconsideration - MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION PLAINTIFF SHEMEKA JORDANS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF COURT ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT; ALTERATIVELY REQUEST

6/5/2023: Motion for Reconsideration - MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION PLAINTIFF SHEMEKA JORDANS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF COURT ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT; ALTERATIVELY REQUEST

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL)

5/23/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL) OF 05/23/2023

5/23/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL) OF 05/23/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME ...)

12/12/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME ...)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL AND RETURN CASE TO ACTIVE CALENDAR

12/9/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL AND RETURN CASE TO ACTIVE CALENDAR

Motion to Vacate - MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL AND PLACE MATTER BACK ON ACTIVE CALENDAR; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL IGOR FRADKIN PROPOS

11/1/2022: Motion to Vacate - MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL AND PLACE MATTER BACK ON ACTIVE CALENDAR; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL IGOR FRADKIN PROPOS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF O...)

10/10/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF O...)

Order - Dismissal

10/10/2022: Order - Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF O...) OF 10/10/2022

10/10/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF O...) OF 10/10/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL)

7/6/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/14/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Motion re: - MOTION RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL AND PLACE MATTER BACK ON ACTIVE CALENDAR; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF'S CO

4/21/2022: Motion re: - MOTION RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL AND PLACE MATTER BACK ON ACTIVE CALENDAR; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF'S CO

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-JURY TRIAL) OF 04/08/2022

4/8/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-JURY TRIAL) OF 04/08/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)

4/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/25/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

10/22/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

10/22/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/9/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/26/2023

Hearing07/26/2023 at 1:30 PM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023

DocketUpdated -- Motion for Reconsideration PLAINTIFF SHEMEKA JORDANS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF COURT ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT; ALTERATIVELY REQUEST FOR RELIEF PURSUANT TO CCP 473(b);: Name Extension: PLAINTIFF SHEMEKA JORDANS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF COURT ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT; ALTERATIVELY REQUEST FOR RELIEF PURSUANT TO CCP 473(b); ; As To Parties:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023

DocketHearing on Motion for Reconsideration scheduled for 07/26/2023 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023

DocketMotion for Reconsideration; Filed by: SHEMEKA JORDAN, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); JOSHUANAY JONES, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2023

DocketUpdated -- Motion to Vacate DISMISSAL AND PLACE MATTER BACK ON ACTIVE CALENDAR; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL IGOR FRADKIN PROPOS: Filed By: JOSHUANAY JONES, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff),SHEMEKA JORDAN, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); Result: Off Calendar ; Result Date: 05/23/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2023

DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Vacate Dismissal)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2023

DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Vacate Dismissal) of 05/23/2023; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2023

DocketHearing on Motion to Vacate Dismissal scheduled for 05/23/2023 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 05/23/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2022

DocketUpdated -- Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time to Hear Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Dismissal and Return Case to Active Calendar: Filed By: SHEMEKA JORDAN, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff),JOSHUANAY JONES, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); Result: Denied ; Result Date: 12/12/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2022

DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time ...)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
29 More Docket Entries
10/22/2020

DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2020

DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2020

DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 03/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2020

DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2020

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 10/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2020

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Kristin S. Escalante in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2020

DocketComplaint; Filed by: SHEMEKA JORDAN, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); JOSHUANAY JONES, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: WALTER FERNANDO MOYA, AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant); ROCKVIEW DAIRIES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant); ROCKVIEW FARMS, UNKNOWN ENTITY (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2020

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SHEMEKA JORDAN, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); JOSHUANAY JONES, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: WALTER FERNANDO MOYA, AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant); ROCKVIEW DAIRIES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant); ROCKVIEW FARMS, UNKNOWN ENTITY (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2020

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: SHEMEKA JORDAN, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); JOSHUANAY JONES, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: WALTER FERNANDO MOYA, AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant); ROCKVIEW DAIRIES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant); ROCKVIEW FARMS, UNKNOWN ENTITY (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2020

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STCV39008 Hearing Date: May 23, 2023 Dept: 29

TENTATIVE

Plaintiff Shemeka Jordan’s Motion to Set Aside the Dismissal is GRANTED.

Legal Standard

Code of Civil Procedure 473(b) provides for mandatory and discretionary relief from dismissal. “The court may, upon any terms as may be just, relieve a party or his or her legal representative from a judgment, dismissal, order, or other proceeding taken against him through his or her mistake, inadvertence, surprise, or excusable neglect.” CCP 473(b). Where such an application for discretionary relief is made, the motion shall be accompanied by a copy of the answer or pleading proposed to be filed, or the application will not be granted. (Id.) The court must grant relief from dismissal where the application is accompanied by an attorney affidavit attesting to his or her mistake, inadvertence, surprise, or neglect. (Id.) In either case, the application must be made within a reasonable time, and in no case exceeding six months after the judgment. (Id.)

Discussion

The motion is timely filed under C.C.P. 473(b). The action was dismissed on October 10, 2022. This Motion to Set Aside the Dismissal was filed on November 1, 2022, within six months after dismissal was entered.

The trial court’s granting or denial of relief under this provision is reviewed for abuse of discretion. (State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. v. Pietak (2001) 90 Cal.App.4th 600, 610.) It is noted that appellate courts are traditionally “favorably disposed toward such action on the part of the trial courts as will permit, rather than prevent, the adjudication of legal controversies on their merits.” (Mercantile Collection Bureau v. Pinheiro (1948) 84 Cal.App.2d 606, 608, citing Benjamin v. Dalmo Mfg. Co. (1947) 31 Cal.2d 523.)

Plaintiff moves for relief on the ground that dismissal was entered due to the mistake, inadvertence, or neglect of Plaintiff’s counsel. On October 10, 2022, the Court dismissed the entire action without prejudice for lack of prosecution pursuant to C.C.P. Sections 583.410 and 583.420(a)(1) when no party appeared for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to file proof of service. Counsel for Plaintiff provides a declaration signed under penalty of perjury, attesting that the hearing date was never entered in the firm calendar. The mistake was discovered when notice of the dismissal was served by the Clerk. (Fradklin Decl., 5-8.)

Because Plaintiff’s counsel has sufficiently established mistake, inadvertence or neglect the dismissal must be set aside.

Conclusion

Accordingly, Plaintiff’s Motion to Set Aside the Dismissal is GRANTED.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.



Case Number: 20STCV39008 Hearing Date: July 6, 2022 Dept: 29

TENTATIVE

Plaintiff Shemeka Jordan’s Motion to Set Aside the Dismissal is GRANTED.

Legal Standard

Code of Civil Procedure 473(b) provides for mandatory and discretionary relief from dismissal. “The court may, upon any terms as may be just, relieve a party or his or her legal representative from a judgment, dismissal, order, or other proceeding taken against him through his or her mistake, inadvertence, surprise, or excusable neglect.” CCP 473(b). Where such an application for discretionary relief is made, the motion shall be accompanied by a copy of the answer or pleading proposed to be filed, or the application will not be granted. (Id.) The court must grant relief from dismissal where the application is accompanied by an attorney affidavit attesting to his or her mistake, inadvertence, surprise, or neglect. (Id.) In either case, the application must be made within a reasonable time, and in no case exceeding six months after the judgment. (Id.)

Discussion

The motion is timely filed under C.C.P. 473(b). The action was dismissed on April 8, 2022. This Motion to Set Aside the Dismissal was filed on April 21, 2022, within six months after dismissal was entered.

The trial court’s granting or denial of relief under this provision is reviewed for abuse of discretion. (State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. v. Pietak (2001) 90 Cal.App.4th 600, 610.) It is noted that appellate courts are traditionally “favorably disposed toward such action on the part of the trial courts as will permit, rather than prevent, the adjudication of legal controversies on their merits.” (Mercantile Collection Bureau v. Pinheiro (1948) 84 Cal.App.2d 606, 608, citing Benjamin v. Dalmo Mfg. Co. (1947) 31 Cal.2d 523.)

Plaintiff moves for relief on the ground that dismissal was entered due to the mistake, inadvertence, or neglect of Plaintiff’s counsel. On April 8, 2022, the Court dismissed the entire action without prejudice for lack of prosecution pursuant to C.C.P. Section 581(b)(3) when Plaintiff did not appear for non-jury trial. Counsel for Plaintiff provides a declaration signed under penalty of perjury, attesting that the Final Status Conference and Trial dates were never entered in the firm calendar. The mistake was discovered when notice of the dismissal was served by the Clerk. (Fradklin Decl., 5-8.)

Because Plaintiff’s counsel has sufficiently established mistake, inadvertence or neglect the dismissal must be set aside. Pursuant to CCP 473(c)(1)(B), Plaintiff's counsel is ordered to pay $500 to the State Bar Client Security Fund within 30 days of this order. Proceedings are reinstated. Matter is set for OSC Re:Dismissal for Failure to file proof of service on the two year date, October 10, 2022 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 29 of the Spring Street Courthouse.

Conclusion

Accordingly, Plaintiff’s Motion to Set Aside the Dismissal is GRANTED.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.