This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/08/2020 at 00:05:39 (UTC).

SHELLY HART VS PACITA ESPINOSA, ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/12/2017 SHELLY HART filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PACITA ESPINOSA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ELIZABETH A. LIPPITT, PAUL A. BACIGALUPO, SHIRLEY K. WATKINS and MICHAEL J. CONVEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6203

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ELIZABETH A. LIPPITT

PAUL A. BACIGALUPO

SHIRLEY K. WATKINS

MICHAEL J. CONVEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

HART SHELLY

Defendants

VOSSOOGHI SHERWIN

MESSINEO DAWN

PLISKY JR. MIKE A

BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY HOMESERVICES OF

THE PLISKY GROUP

REICH PACITA ESPINOSA

ESPINOSA PACITA

SUMMER SHORE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC.

EVEREST REALTY GROUP LTD

VOSS SHERWIN JACOB

LOS ANGELES COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC

VOSSOOGHI KARIM DAVID

TROOP PREMIER PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

PICKFORD REAL ESTATE INC.

DOES 1 TO 20

VOSS CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT IN.

GEORGE E REICH A TRUSTEE OF THE

MOSIER MARTHA (DOE 3)

Not Classified By Court

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

HRIBAR JOHN ANTHONY

Defendant Attorneys

SAFARIAN AROUTUN HARRY

KOLCZ DANIEL J.

OBRAND JESSE D.

MOORE MICHAEL LANE

RING BART IVAN

KLIER-ERLICH RINAT B.

DAVIS CALVIN EUGENE

ERLICH RINAT B

WEINSTEIN MARK ALAN

ZIMET MARC JOSEPH

OBRAND JESSE DAVID

KOLCZ DANIEL JOSEPH

Other Attorneys

BIHR BERNHARD EUGENE

KERR JOHN DALE

 

Court Documents

Opposition - OPPOSITION EVEREST REALTY GROUP CALIFORNIA, LTD (DBA TROOP PREMIER PROPERTY MANAGEMENT), MIKE A. PLISKY, JR. (DBA THE PLISKY GROUP) AND KRISTEN PLISKY (DBA THE PLISKY GROUP)(DOE 4)'S OPPO

6/13/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION EVEREST REALTY GROUP CALIFORNIA, LTD (DBA TROOP PREMIER PROPERTY MANAGEMENT), MIKE A. PLISKY, JR. (DBA THE PLISKY GROUP) AND KRISTEN PLISKY (DBA THE PLISKY GROUP)(DOE 4)'S OPPO

Declaration - DECLARATION REPORTING BART RING'S REFUSAL TO PROPERLY SERVE PLAINTIFF ANY OF HIS OBSESSIVE FILINGS

6/18/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION REPORTING BART RING'S REFUSAL TO PROPERLY SERVE PLAINTIFF ANY OF HIS OBSESSIVE FILINGS

Declaration - DECLARATION OBJECTING TO THE GENERAL RELEASE LODGED ON 7/19/19

7/22/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OBJECTING TO THE GENERAL RELEASE LODGED ON 7/19/19

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSALS OF VO...)

8/20/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSALS OF VO...)

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Declaration

6/4/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Declaration

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Opposition

6/7/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Opposition

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service -

7/16/2018: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service -

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order -

8/3/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order -

Minute Order -

8/22/2018: Minute Order -

Complaint -

8/28/2018: Complaint -

Proof of Personal Service -

9/13/2018: Proof of Personal Service -

Request for Judicial Notice

9/14/2018: Request for Judicial Notice

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Opposition

9/14/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Opposition

Notice of Lodging - Notice of Lodging of Beth Chrisman Certified Forensic Document Examiner Opinion

11/13/2018: Notice of Lodging - Notice of Lodging of Beth Chrisman Certified Forensic Document Examiner Opinion

Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

1/14/2019: Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Proof of Electronic Service

2/7/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Proof of Electronic Service

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING AND LODGING OF THE TRANSCRIPT FROM DAWN MESSINEO'S DEPOSITION

4/19/2019: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING AND LODGING OF THE TRANSCRIPT FROM DAWN MESSINEO'S DEPOSITION

Declaration - DECLARATION REQUESTING COURT UPDATE ITS SERVICE LIST

5/6/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION REQUESTING COURT UPDATE ITS SERVICE LIST

359 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2020
  • Hearing01/15/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department U at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • Hearing01/15/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department U at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (as to the Cross-Complaint filed by Espinosa-Reich and Reich as to Wesco Insurance Company Only); Filed by Pacita Espinosa (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department U, Michael J. Convey, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (Recusal) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department U, Michael J. Convey, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department U, Michael J. Convey, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (as to the Complaint); Filed by Shelly Hart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal; Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Pacita Espinosa (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
676 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Shelly Hart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Shelly Hart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Shelly Hart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Shelly Hart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Shelly Hart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Shelly Hart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Shelly Hart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Shelly Hart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Shelly Hart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUMMER SHORE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Everest Realty Group California LTD is a litigant

Latest cases where BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY HOMESERVICES CALIFORNIA PROPERTIES is a litigant

Latest cases where Pickford Real Estate , INC; DBA : Berkshire Hathaway Homeservices California Properties is a litigant