This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/02/2022 at 05:54:37 (UTC).

SHELIA RICHARDS VS FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/04/2022 SHELIA RICHARDS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5266

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RICHARDS SHELIA

Defendants

CASTANEDA OSCAR

COAST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

FARMERS GROUP INC.

FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE

FARMERS NEW WORLD LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

FARMERS SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE

FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY GRAND RAPIDS MICHIGAN

JOHNSON DANA

MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY

SALIMIAN SAMUEL

TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE

TRUCK UNDERWRITERS ASSOCIATION

ZURICH INSURANCE COMPANY LTD

ZURICH INSURANCE COMPANY NORTH AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHEGERIAN CARNEY

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

11/29/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/28/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/28/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/28/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/28/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/28/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/28/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/28/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/28/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/28/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Dismissal

11/22/2022: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service

11/17/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/17/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/17/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/14/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED AGAINST...)

11/10/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED AGAINST...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED AGAINST...) OF 11/10/2022

11/10/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED AGAINST...) OF 11/10/2022

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

11/9/2022: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2023
  • Hearing03/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Shelia Richards (Plaintiff); As to: Samuel Salimian (Defendant); Service Date: 11/21/2022; Service Cost: 125.20; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Shelia Richards (Plaintiff); As to: Farmers Insurance Exchange (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/21/2022; Service Cost: 154.10; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Shelia Richards (Plaintiff); As to: Farmers Group Inc. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/21/2022; Service Cost: 154.10; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Shelia Richards (Plaintiff); As to: Farmers Specialty Insurance Company (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/21/2022; Service Cost: 154.10; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Shelia Richards (Plaintiff); As to: Mid-Century Insurance Company (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/21/2022; Service Cost: 154.10; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Shelia Richards (Plaintiff); As to: Truck Insurance Exchange (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/21/2022; Service Cost: 154.10; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Shelia Richards (Plaintiff); As to: Truck Underwriters Association (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/21/2022; Service Cost: 154.10; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Shelia Richards (Plaintiff); As to: Fire Insurance Exchange (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/21/2022; Service Cost: 154.10; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Shelia Richards (Plaintiff); As to: Foremost Insurance Company, Grand Rapids, Michigan (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/21/2022; Service Cost: 154.10; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Plaintiff's Peremptory Challenge filed against...) of 11/10/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by: Shelia Richards (Plaintiff); Judge Name: William F. Fahey

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Shelia Richards (Plaintiff); As to: Farmers Insurance Exchange (Defendant); Farmers Group Inc. (Defendant); Truck Insurance Exchange (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William F. Fahey in Department 69 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Shelia Richards (Plaintiff); As to: Farmers Insurance Exchange (Defendant); Farmers Group Inc. (Defendant); Truck Insurance Exchange (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Shelia Richards (Plaintiff); As to: Farmers Insurance Exchange (Defendant); Farmers Group Inc. (Defendant); Truck Insurance Exchange (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRUCK UNDERWRITERS ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ZURICH INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where FARMERS SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant