This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/07/2023 at 02:47:05 (UTC).

SHELBY H. HARO VS PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM-SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/16/2022 SHELBY H HARO filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM-SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN J. KRALIK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0587

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN J. KRALIK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARO SHELBY H.

Defendants

BARRAGAR CHRISTINA

BURBANK EMERGENCY MEDICAL GROUP INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CHOULJIAN P.A. HAROUT

FAKOORY NADIA JEAN M.D.

KISHINIFF STEOHEN EDWARD M.D.

PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM-SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA PROVIDENCE ST JOSEPH MEDICAL CENTER

SAHELLIMOGHAVAMI NAHAL P.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FLANAGAN JOHN MICHAEL

Defendant Attorneys

SACCOMANO JENNIFER BICKNELL

SHUBE SUSAN ELISE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/11/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

12/27/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

12/27/2022: Case Management Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION REGARDING DESIGNATION OF TRIAL COUNSEL

12/15/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION REGARDING DESIGNATION OF TRIAL COUNSEL

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

10/18/2022: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal

10/12/2022: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service

9/20/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE

9/20/2022: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/21/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

9/21/2022: Answer

Answer

9/21/2022: Answer

Answer

9/21/2022: Answer

Answer

9/21/2022: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

9/21/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

9/21/2022: Answer

Answer

9/21/2022: Answer

Answer

9/22/2022: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

9/22/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2023
  • Hearing11/13/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department B at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2023
  • Hearing11/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2023
  • Hearing08/04/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department B at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) scheduled for 08/04/2023 at 10:00 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 11/13/2023 at 09:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department B updated: Result Date to 01/11/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Shelby H. Haro (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Burbank Emergency Medical Group Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Nahal Sahellimoghavami, P.A. (Defendant); Nadia Jean Fakoory, M.D. (Defendant); Steohen Edward Kishiniff, M.D. (Defendant); Christina Barragar, (Defendant); Harout Chouljian, P.A. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Shelby H. Haro (Plaintiff); As to: Burbank Emergency Medical Group Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 08/25/2022; Service Cost: 79.70; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Shelby H. Haro (Plaintiff); As to: Providence Health System-Southern California, a California Corporation (Defendant); Burbank Emergency Medical Group Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Nahal Sahellimoghavami, P.A. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Shelby H. Haro (Plaintiff); As to: Providence Health System-Southern California, a California Corporation (Defendant); Burbank Emergency Medical Group Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Nahal Sahellimoghavami, P.A. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Shelby H. Haro (Plaintiff); As to: Providence Health System-Southern California, a California Corporation (Defendant); Burbank Emergency Medical Group Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Nahal Sahellimoghavami, P.A. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. John J. Kralik in Department B Burbank Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less