This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/17/2021 at 00:58:03 (UTC).

SHELBY GRIFFITHS VS SOUTHWEST WINE & SPIRITS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/27/2019 SHELBY GRIFFITHS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SOUTHWEST WINE SPIRITS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0390

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRIFFITHS SHELBY

Defendants

TURNER MATTHEW

SOUTHWEST WINE & SPIRITS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA WALLY'S WINE & SPIRITS DBA WALLY'S BEVERLY HILLS DBA WALLY'S SANTA MONICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEINMAN JONATHAN AARON

Defendant Attorney

SELVAN BRIAN A.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

1/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 01/15/2021

1/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 01/15/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE DISMISSAL OF UNSERVED/UNNAMED DOES)

7/2/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE DISMISSAL OF UNSERVED/UNNAMED DOES)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/27/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/30/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service by Mail

12/30/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

12/30/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Case Management Statement

12/30/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/8/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

10/30/2019: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/5/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/5/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

8/30/2019: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/30/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/27/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/27/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/27/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/27/2019: Complaint

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Final Status Conference) of 01/15/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by SHELBY GRIFFITHS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Non-Appearance Case Review (re dismissal of unserved/unnamed Does) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 74; Non-Appearance Case Review (re dismissal of unserved/unnamed Does) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review re dismissal of unserved/unnamed Does) of 07/02/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re dismissal of unserved/unnamed Does)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • Docketat 2:39 PM in Department 74; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service As T...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SOUTHWEST WINE & SPIRITS, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); MATTHEW TURNER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by SHELBY GRIFFITHS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by SHELBY GRIFFITHS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SHELBY GRIFFITHS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SHELBY GRIFFITHS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SHELBY GRIFFITHS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHWEST WINE & SPIRITS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEINMAN JONATHAN A.