This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/21/2021 at 19:44:21 (UTC).

SHEILA CASAS VS JOHN DOE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/15/2021 SHEILA CASAS filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOHN DOE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2359

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASAS SHEILA

Defendants

DOE JOHN

STILLWATER INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ZEESMAN ALEXANDER JOSHUA

ZEESMAN DIANA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/15/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

6/23/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Personal Service

7/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Separate Statement

9/7/2021: Separate Statement

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

9/7/2021: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2024
  • Hearing06/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • Hearing12/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • Hearing11/29/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • Hearing04/11/2022 at 1:30 PM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Filed by Sheila Casas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketSeparate Statement; Filed by Sheila Casas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Sheila Casas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sheila Casas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sheila Casas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sheila Casas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Stillwater Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZEESMAN DIANA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZEESMAN ALEXANDER JOSHUA