This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/27/2022 at 16:32:45 (UTC).

SHEILA BIGLANG-AWA CASTRO VS HOBBY LOBBY STORES, INC., A OKLAHOMA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 SHEILA BIGLANG-AWA CASTRO filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against HOBBY LOBBY STORES, INC , A OKLAHOMA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0084

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BIGLANG-AWA CASTRO SHEILA

Defendant

HOBBY LOBBY STORES INC. A OKLAHOMA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANNING JR. JOSEPH

Defendant Attorney

ROLLER AMBER L

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/19/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/19/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/19/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/19/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/20/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

3/22/2022: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/3/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2022
  • Hearing06/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department T at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by HOBBY LOBBY STORES, INC., a Oklahoma corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Sheila Biglang-Awa Castro (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sheila Biglang-Awa Castro (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sheila Biglang-Awa Castro (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sheila Biglang-Awa Castro (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOBBY LOBBY STORES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amber L Roller