Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/13/2021 at 13:46:27 (UTC).

SHEILA AULA VS JUAN RAMIREZ

Case Summary

On 10/07/2020 SHEILA AULA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JUAN RAMIREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8482

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AULA SHEILA

Defendant

RAMIREZ JUAN

Not Classified By Court

RESNIK REINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RESNIK REINA

Defendant Attorney

DACEY JENNIFER MARIE

 

Court Documents

Demand for Jury Trial

11/18/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

11/18/2020: Answer

PI General Order

10/27/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/7/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/7/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/7/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/7/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2023
  • Hearing10/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • Hearing04/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • Hearing03/23/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by JUAN RAMIREZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by JUAN RAMIREZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SHEILA AULA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SHEILA AULA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SHEILA AULA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less