This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/10/2021 at 16:31:28 (UTC).

SHEENA POWELS VS EDUARDO GONZALES PEREZ

Case Summary

On 09/09/2021 SHEENA POWELS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against EDUARDO GONZALES PEREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3278

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

POWELS SHEENA

Defendant

PEREZ EDUARDO GONZALES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IVIE RICKEY ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2024
  • Hearing09/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • Hearing03/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • Hearing02/23/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sheena Powels (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sheena Powels (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sheena Powels (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer IVIE RICKEY ESQ.