Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/09/2019 at 04:48:05 (UTC).

SHAYAN ABARGHOEI VS NISSAN EXTENDED SERVICES

Case Summary

On 11/13/2017 SHAYAN ABARGHOEI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NISSAN EXTENDED SERVICES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN P. PFAHLER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8098

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN P. PFAHLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABARGHOEI SHAYAN

Defendants

GLENDALE INFINITY

NISSAN EXTENDED SERVICES NORTH AMERICA

THE PEP BOYS MANNY MOE & JACK OF

INFINITY GLENDALE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHAIN BETTY S.

CHAIN BETTY STASZEK

Defendant Attorneys

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

BOWMAN & BROOKE

MOLONEY MEEGAN

THOMAS ANTHONY SAMUEL

 

Court Documents

Unknown

11/13/2017: Unknown

Notice

11/13/2017: Notice

Notice of Case Assignment

11/13/2017: Notice of Case Assignment

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

11/29/2017: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

11/30/2017: Answer

Unknown

12/18/2017: Unknown

Unknown

1/11/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

4/12/2018: Minute Order

Substitution of Attorney

7/20/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Unknown

7/30/2018: Unknown

Notice of Change of Firm Name

7/30/2018: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Unknown

10/9/2018: Unknown

Order

10/25/2018: Order

Notice

11/2/2018: Notice

Notice of Settlement

2/14/2019: Notice of Settlement

Unknown

2/15/2019: Unknown

Minute Order

4/3/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

4/3/2019: Unknown

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F49, Stephen P. Pfahler, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by SHAYAN ABARGHOEI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F49, Stephen P. Pfahler, Presiding; Order to Show Cause - Hearing (reDismissal Date) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Order to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date) of 04/03/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by SHAYAN ABARGHOEI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F49, Stephen P. Pfahler, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F49, Stephen P. Pfahler, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F49, Stephen P. Pfahler, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by SHAYAN ABARGHOEI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • Answer; Filed by NISSAN EXTENDED SERVICES NORTH AMERICA, (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • Answer; Filed by THE PEP BOYS MANNY MOE & JACK OF (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by SHAYAN ABARGHOEI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Notice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SHAYAN ABARGHOEI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GLENDALE INFINITI INC is a litigant

Latest cases where THE PEP BOYS MANNY MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHAIN BETTY STASZEK ESQ.