Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2019 at 07:24:50 (UTC).

SHAWN SHARHAM SAJADI VS. JOSEPH PEAKS DURANT, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/08/2017 SHAWN SHARHAM SAJADI filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JOSEPH PEAKS DURANT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MELVIN D. SANDVIG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7739

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MELVIN D. SANDVIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SAJADI ZHILA TAYMOURI

SAJADI SHAWN SHAHRAN

Defendants

PANAHPOUR BEHNOUSH

ASVAR KAYVON

VENETIAN REALTY & FINANCE INC

SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING INC

VENETIAN REALTY AND FINANCE

DURANT JOSEPH PEAKS

ASVAR KAVEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ULLOA ADELA Z. APC

Other Attorneys

SCHORR LAW A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

DYKEMA GOSSETT LLP

 

Court Documents

Unknown

6/15/2017: Unknown

Unknown

6/15/2017: Unknown

Answer

6/27/2017: Answer

Unknown

7/26/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

8/16/2017: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

8/25/2017: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling

8/25/2017: Notice of Ruling

Unknown

11/14/2017: Unknown

Unknown

11/20/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

2/1/2018: Minute Order

Substitution of Attorney

3/7/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

3/7/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

3/20/2018: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order

5/2/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

5/8/2018: Notice of Ruling

Unknown

5/23/2018: Unknown

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/9/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/15/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

90 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2019
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by SHAWN SHAHRAN SAJADI (Plaintiff); ZHILA TAYMOURI SAJADI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by SHAWN SHAHRAN SAJADI (Plaintiff); ZHILA TAYMOURI SAJADI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by SHAWN SHAHRAN SAJADI (Plaintiff); ZHILA TAYMOURI SAJADI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by SHAWN SHAHRAN SAJADI (Plaintiff); ZHILA TAYMOURI SAJADI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by SHAWN SHAHRAN SAJADI (Plaintiff); ZHILA TAYMOURI SAJADI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by SHAWN SHAHRAN SAJADI (Plaintiff); ZHILA TAYMOURI SAJADI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Answer; Filed by KAYVON ASVAR (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Answer; Filed by BEHNOUSH PANAHPOUR (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Hearing - Other (DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING SETTING) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing - Other DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING SETTING)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
108 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2017
  • Demurrer; Filed by SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC(DISM) (Defendant); WRIGHT, FINLAY & ZAK, LLP (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC(DISM) (Defendant); WRIGHT, FINLAY & ZAK, LLP (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by SHAWN SHAHRAN SAJADI (Plaintiff); ZHILA TAYMOURI SAJADI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by SHAWN SHAHRAN SAJADI (Plaintiff); ZHILA TAYMOURI SAJADI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • Notice of Lis Pendens; Filed by SHAWN SHAHRAN SAJADI (Plaintiff); ZHILA TAYMOURI SAJADI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SHAWN SHAHRAN SAJADI (Plaintiff); ZHILA TAYMOURI SAJADI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • Notice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: PC057739    Hearing Date: December 15, 2020    Dept: F47

Dept. F-47

Date: 12/15/20

Case #PC057739

MOTION TO DEEM RFAs ADMITTED

Motion filed on 8/17/20.

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiffs Shawn Sajadi and Zhila Sajadi

RESPONDING PARTY: Defendant Kayvon Asvar aka Kaven Asvar

NOTICE: ok

RELIEF REQUESTED: An order establishing the truth of each matter specified in the Requests for Admissions, Set 2* served on Defendant Kayvon Asvar aka Kaven Asvar by Plaintiff Zhila Taymouri Sajadi. Additionally, Plaintiffs request sanctions against Asvar and his counsel, Michael Stoller, in the amount of $976.65.

*The face of the RFAs served on 6/10/20 were mistakenly designated as Set 1. However, the RFAs served on 3/16/20, which are the subject of another motion set to be heard on 12/15/20, were actually Set 1. (See Motion p.3 footnote 3).

RULING: The unopposed motion is granted as set forth below.

This action arises out of Plaintiffs’ claims to certain real property. Plaintiffs Shawn Shahram Sajadi and Zhila Taymouri Sajadi allege they had an agreement to purchase the Property from Defendant Joseph Peaks Durant, but the property was conveyed to Defendant Behnoush Panahpour as a result of defendants’ alleged breach of contract, fraud, and breach of fiduciary duties. On 5/8/17, Plaintiffs filed this action seeking redress from Defendants Joseph Peaks Durant, Behnoush Panahpour, Kayvon Asvar aka Kaven Asvar, Venetian Realty & Finance, Inc. aka Venetian Realty and Finance, and Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. On 5/16/17, Plaintiffs recorded a Notice of Pendency of Action (lis pendens).

On 6/10/20, Plaintiff Zhila Taymouri Sajadi served the subject requests for admissions by e-mail on Asvar’s counsel of record. (Heller Decl.). As such, responses were due by 7/15/20. No responses were served. (Heller Decl.). Due to Asvar’s failure to respond to the requests for admissions, Plaintiffs are entitled to an order deeming the matters admitted. CCP 2033.280(b), (c). Additionally, an award of sanctions is mandatory. Id. Therefore, sanctions are imposed against Asvar and his attorney, Michael Stoller, in the amount of $796.65, payable within 30 days. The amount of sanctions awarded is reduced from the $976.65 requested because the hearings on the 5 discovery motions were consolidated requiring only one appearance. (See Heller Decl. ¶15). As such, the Court finds that two hours for preparation and appearance on all five motions at $450/hour is reasonable. The $900 amount was divided by 5 thereby allocating $180 for preparation and appearance to this motion.

Dept. F-47

Date: 12/15/20

Case #PC057739

MOTION TO DEEM RFAs ADMITTED

Motion filed on 8/17/20.

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiffs Shawn Sajadi and Zhila Sajadi

RESPONDING PARTY: Defendant Kayvon Asvar aka Kaven Asvar

NOTICE: ok

RELIEF REQUESTED: An order establishing the truth of each matter specified in the Requests for Admissions, Set 1 served on Defendant Kayvon Asvar aka Kaven Asvar by Plaintiff Zhila Taymouri Sajadi.  Additionally, Plaintiffs request sanctions against Asvar and his counsel, Michael Stoller, in the amount of $976.65.

RULING: The unopposed motion is granted as set forth below.   

This action arises out of Plaintiffs’ claims to certain real property.  Plaintiffs Shawn Shahram Sajadi and Zhila Taymouri Sajadi allege they had an agreement to purchase the Property from Defendant Joseph Peaks Durant, but the property was conveyed to Defendant Behnoush Panahpour as a result of defendants’ alleged breach of contract, fraud, and breach of fiduciary duties. On 5/8/17, Plaintiffs filed this action seeking redress from Defendants Joseph Peaks Durant, Behnoush Panahpour, Kayvon Asvar aka Kaven Asvar, Venetian Realty & Finance, Inc. aka Venetian Realty and Finance, and Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. On 5/16/17, Plaintiffs recorded a Notice of Pendency of Action (lis pendens). 

On 3/16/20, Plaintiff Zhila Taymouri Sajadi served the subject requests for admissions by mail on Asvar’s counsel of record.  (Heller Decl.).  As such, responses were due by 4/21/20.  No responses were served.  (Heller Decl.).  Due to Asvar’s failure to respond to the requests for admissions, Plaintiffs are entitled to an order deeming the matters admitted.  CCP 2033.280(b), (c).  Additionally, an award of sanctions is mandatory.  Id.  Therefore, sanctions are imposed against Asvar and his attorney, Michael Stoller, in the amount of $796.65, payable within 30 days.  The amount of sanctions awarded is reduced from the $976.65 requested because the hearings on the 5 discovery motions were consolidated requiring only one appearance.  (See Heller Decl. ¶15).  As such, the Court finds that two hours for preparation and appearance on all five motions at $450/hour is reasonable.  The $900 amount was divided by 5 thereby allocating $180 for preparation and appearance to this motion.    

Dept. F-47

Date: 12/15/20

Case #PC057739

MOTION TO DEEM RFAs ADMITTED

Motion filed on 8/17/20.

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiffs Shawn Sajadi and Zhila Sajadi

RESPONDING PARTY: Defendant Behnoush Panahpour

NOTICE: ok

RELIEF REQUESTED: An order establishing the truth of each matter specified in the Requests for Admissions, Set 2* served on Defendant Behnoush Panahpour by Plaintiff Zhila Taymouri Sajadi.  Additionally, Plaintiffs request sanctions against Panahpour and her counsel, Michael Stoller, in the amount of $976.65.

*The face of the RFAs served on 6/10/20 were mistakenly designated as Set 1.  However, the RFAs served on 3/16/20, which are the subject of another motion set to be heard on 12/15/20, were actually Set 1.  (See Motion, p.3 footnote 3).

RULING: The unopposed motion is granted as set forth below.   

This action arises out of Plaintiffs’ claims to certain real property.  Plaintiffs Shawn Shahram Sajadi and Zhila Taymouri Sajadi allege they had an agreement to purchase the Property from Defendant Joseph Peaks Durant, but the property was conveyed to Defendant Behnoush Panahpour as a result of defendants’ alleged breach of contract, fraud, and breach of fiduciary duties. On 5/8/17, Plaintiffs filed this action seeking redress from Defendants Joseph Peaks Durant, Behnoush Panahpour, Kayvon Asvar aka Kaven Asvar, Venetian Realty & Finance, Inc. aka Venetian Realty and Finance, and Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. On 5/16/17, Plaintiffs recorded a Notice of Pendency of Action (lis pendens). 

On 6/10/20, Plaintiff Zhila Taymouri Sajadi served the subject requests for admissions by e-mail on Panahpour’s counsel of record.  (Heller Decl.).  As such, responses were due by 7/15/20.  No responses were served.  (Heller Decl.).  Due to Panahpour’s failure to respond to the requests for admissions, Plaintiffs are entitled to an order deeming the matters admitted.  CCP 2033.280(b), (c).  Additionally, an award of sanctions is mandatory.  Id.  Therefore, sanctions are imposed against Panahpour and her attorney, Michael Stoller, in the amount of $796.65, payable within 30 days.  The amount of sanctions awarded is reduced from the $976.65 requested because the hearings on the 5 discovery motions were consolidated requiring only one appearance.  (See Heller Decl. ¶15).  As such, the Court finds that two hours for preparation and appearance on all five motions at $450/hour is reasonable.  The $900 amount was divided by 5 thereby allocating $180 for preparation and appearance to this motion.    

Dept. F-47

Date: 12/15/20

Case #PC057739

MOTION TO DEEM RFAs ADMITTED

Motion filed on 8/17/20.

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiffs Shawn Sajadi and Zhila Sajadi

RESPONDING PARTY: Defendant Behnoush Panahpour

NOTICE: ok

RELIEF REQUESTED: An order establishing the truth of each matter specified in the Requests for Admissions, Set 1 served on Defendant Behnoush Panahpour by Plaintiff Zhila Taymouri Sajadi.  Additionally, Plaintiffs request sanctions against Panahpour and her counsel, Michael Stoller, in the amount of $976.65.

RULING: The unopposed motion is granted as set forth below.   

This action arises out of Plaintiffs’ claims to certain real property.  Plaintiffs Shawn Shahram Sajadi and Zhila Taymouri Sajadi allege they had an agreement to purchase the Property from Defendant Joseph Peaks Durant, but the property was conveyed to Defendant Behnoush Panahpour as a result of defendants’ alleged breach of contract, fraud, and breach of fiduciary duties. On 5/8/17, Plaintiffs filed this action seeking redress from Defendants Joseph Peaks Durant, Behnoush Panahpour, Kayvon Asvar aka Kaven Asvar, Venetian Realty & Finance, Inc. aka Venetian Realty and Finance, and Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. On 5/16/17, Plaintiffs recorded a Notice of Pendency of Action (lis pendens). 

On 3/16/20, Plaintiff Zhila Taymouri Sajadi served the subject requests for admissions by mail on Panahpour’s counsel of record.  (Heller Decl.).  As such, responses were due by 4/21/20.  No responses were served.  (Heller Decl.).  Due to Panahpour’s failure to respond to the requests for admissions, Plaintiffs are entitled to an order deeming the matters admitted.  CCP 2033.280(b), (c).  Additionally, an award of sanctions is mandatory.  Id.  Therefore, sanctions are imposed against Panahpour and her attorney, Michael Stoller, in the amount of $796.65, payable within 30 days.  The amount of sanctions awarded is reduced from the $976.65 requested because the hearings on the 5 discovery motions were consolidated requiring only one appearance.  (See Heller Decl. ¶15).  As such, the Court finds that two hours for preparation and appearance on all five motions at $450/hour is reasonable.  The $900 amount was divided by 5 thereby allocating $180 for preparation and appearance to this motion.    

Dept. F-47

Date: 12/15/20

Case #PC057739

MOTION TO DEEM RFAs ADMITTED

Motion filed on 8/17/20.

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiffs Shawn Sajadi and Zhila Sajadi

RESPONDING PARTY: Defendant Venetian Realty & Finance

NOTICE: ok

RELIEF REQUESTED: An order establishing the truth of each matter specified in the Requests for Admissions, Set 1 served on Defendant Venetian Realty & Finance by Plaintiff Zhila Taymouri Sajadi.  Additionally, Plaintiffs request sanctions against Venetian and its counsel, Michael Stoller, in the amount of $976.65.

RULING: The motion is placed off calendar.   

Default having been entered as to Defendant Venetian Realty & Finance, motion to deem Requests for Admissions, Set One, served on 6/10/20, 2020, as to Defendant Venetian Realty & Finance and request for sanctions, filed by Zhila Taymouri Sajadi and Shawn Shahran Sajadi on 8/17/20 is placed off calendar. 

Case Number: PC057739    Hearing Date: September 18, 2020    Dept: F47

Dept. F-47

Date: 9/18/20

Case #PC057739

MOTION TO DEEM RFAs ADMITTED

Motion filed on 4/9/20.

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiffs Shawn Shahram Sajadi and Zhila Taymouri Sajadi

RESPONDING PARTY: Defendant Kayvon Asvar aka Kaven Asvar

NOTICE: ok

RELIEF REQUESTED: An order establishing the truth of each matter specified in the Requests for Admissions, Set 1 served on Defendant Kayvon Asvar aka Kaven Asvar. Additionally, Plaintiffs request sanctions against Asvar and his counsel, Michael Stoller, in the amount of $1,611.00.

RULING: The unopposed motion is granted as set forth below.

This action arises out of Plaintiffs’ claims to certain real property. Plaintiffs Shawn Shahram Sajadi and Zhila Taymouri Sajadi allege they had an agreement to purchase the Property from Defendant Joseph Peaks Durant, but the property was conveyed to Defendant Behnoush Panahpour as a result of defendants’ alleged breach of contract, fraud, and breach of fiduciary duties. On 5/8/17, Plaintiffs filed this action seeking redress from Defendants Joseph Peaks Durant, Behnoush Panahpour, Kayvon Asvar aka Kaven Asvar, Venetian Realty & Finance, Inc. aka Venetian Realty and Finance, and Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. On 5/16/17, Plaintiffs recorded a Notice of Pendency of Action (lis pendens).

On 2/27/20, Plaintiffs served the subject requests for admissions by mail on Asvar’s counsel of record. (Heller Decl.). As such, responses were due by 4/2/20. No responses were served. (Heller Decl.). Due to Asvar’s failure to respond to the requests for admissions, Plaintiffs are entitled to an order deeming the matters admitted. CCP 2033.280(b), (c). Additionally, an award of sanctions is mandatory. Id. Therefore, sanctions are imposed against Asvar and his attorney, Michael Stoller, in the amount of $500.00, payable within 30 days.

Dept. F-47

Date: 9/18/20

Case #PC057739

MOTION TO DEEM RFAs ADMITTED

Motion filed on 4/9/20.

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiffs Shawn Shahram Sajadi and Zhila Taymouri Sajadi

RESPONDING PARTY: Defendant Behnoush Panahpour

NOTICE: ok

RELIEF REQUESTED: An order establishing the truth of each matter specified in the Requests for Admissions, Set 1 served on Defendant Behnoush Panahpour. Additionally, Plaintiffs request sanctions against Panahpour and his counsel, Michael Stoller, in the amount of $1,611.00.

RULING: The unopposed motion is granted as set forth below.

This action arises out of Plaintiffs’ claims to certain real property. Plaintiffs Shawn Shahram Sajadi and Zhila Taymouri Sajadi allege they had an agreement to purchase the Property from Defendant Joseph Peaks Durant, but the property was conveyed to Defendant Behnoush Panahpour as a result of defendants’ alleged breach of contract, fraud, and breach of fiduciary duties. On 5/8/17, Plaintiffs filed this action seeking redress from Defendants Joseph Peaks Durant, Behnoush Panahpour, Kayvon Asvar aka Kaven Asvar, Venetian Realty & Finance, Inc. aka Venetian Realty and Finance, and Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. On 5/16/17, Plaintiffs recorded a Notice of Pendency of Action (lis pendens).

On 2/27/20, Plaintiffs served the subject requests for admissions by mail on Panahpour’s counsel of record. (Heller Decl.). As such, responses were due by 4/2/20. No responses were served. (Heller Decl.). Due to Panahpour’s failure to respond to the requests for admissions, Plaintiffs are entitled to an order deeming the matters admitted. CCP 2033.280(b), (c). Additionally, an award of sanctions is mandatory. Id. Therefore, sanctions are imposed against Panahpour and his attorney, Michael Stoller, in the amount of $500.00, payable within 30 days.

Dept. F-47

Date: 9/18/20

Case #PC057739

MOTION TO DEEM RFAs ADMITTED

Motion filed on 4/9/20.

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiffs Shawn Shahram Sajadi and Zhila Taymouri Sajadi

RESPONDING PARTY: Defendant Venetian Realty & Finance

RELIEF REQUESTED: An order establishing the truth of each matter specified in the Requests for Admissions, Set 1 served on Defendant Venetian Realty & Finance. Additionally, Plaintiffs request sanctions against Venetian and its counsel, Michael Stoller, in the amount of $1,611.00;

RULING: The motion is placed off calendar.

On 4/9/20, the motion was served by mail on attorney Michael T. Stoller who Plaintiffs claim is Defendant Venetian Realty & Finance’s counsel of record. (Heller Decl. ¶7). The underlying discovery was also served on attorney Stoller. (Heller Decl. ¶9). However, no substitution of attorney has been filed indicating attorney Stoller is now representing this defendant. On 3/6/20, Substitution of Attorney forms were filed indicating that attorney Stoller substituted in as counsel for Behnoush Panahpour and Kayvon Asvar. Defendant Venetian Realty & Finance has not responded to the motion. As such, there is no evidence that Defendant Venetian Realty & Finance had proper notice of this motion or the underlying discovery.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. is a litigant