This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/30/2022 at 12:39:12 (UTC).

SHAWN JOSEPH VS BIO-MEDICAL APPLICATIONS OF CALIFORNIA, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/17/2022 SHAWN JOSEPH filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BIO-MEDICAL APPLICATIONS OF CALIFORNIA, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9871

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOSEPH SHAWN

Defendants

BIO-MEDICAL APPLICATIONS OF CALIFORNIA INC.

FRENESIUS MEDICAL CARE NORTH AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VARGAS ERNEST A

Defendant Attorney

LEE AGGIE B.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6/17/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

6/17/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

6/17/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

6/17/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/17/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/17/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/17/2022: Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/27/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

7/25/2022: Answer

Request for Dismissal

9/15/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Shawn Joseph (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Shawn Joseph (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by BIO-MEDICAL APPLICATIONS OF CALIFORNIA, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Shawn Joseph (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Shawn Joseph (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Shawn Joseph (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less