This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/07/2021 at 21:12:11 (UTC).

SHAVONA TONETTE MILLER, AN INDIVIDUAL VS SMART & FINAL STORES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 09/15/2021 SHAVONA TONETTE MILLER, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SMART FINAL STORES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4108

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MILLER AN INDIVIDUAL SHAVONA TONETTE

Defendant

SMART & FINAL STORES LLC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROFAEL JOHN R. ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2024
  • Hearing09/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • Hearing03/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • Hearing03/01/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SHAVONA TONETTE MILLER, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SHAVONA TONETTE MILLER, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SHAVONA TONETTE MILLER, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SMART & FINAL STORES LLC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROFAEL JOHN R.