This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/04/2019 at 02:43:24 (UTC).

SHAVER, KORFF & CASTRONOVO LLP VS VOSS, SILVERMAN & BRAYBROO

Case Summary

On 06/15/2018 SHAVER, KORFF CASTRONOVO LLP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VOSS, SILVERMAN BRAYBROO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9429

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHAVER KORFF & CASTRONOVO LLP

Defendants

VOSS SILVERMNA & BRAYBROOKE LLC

VOSS SILVERMAN & BRAYBROOKE LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CASTRONOVO TOD M.

Defendant Attorney

VOSS DAVID CRAIN JR

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service -

8/9/2018: Proof of Personal Service -

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Proof-Service/Summons

8/9/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Proof-Service/Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/15/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

6/15/2018: Summons

Complaint

6/15/2018: Complaint

Answer

10/17/2018: Answer

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

11/30/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling RE: Case Management Conference

12/12/2018: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling RE: Case Management Conference

Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference;)

12/12/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference;)

Notice - Notice NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

12/12/2018: Notice - Notice NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Case Management Statement

12/4/2018: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement - Case Management Statement 12-12-18 8:30 am Dept M

11/28/2018: Case Management Statement - Case Management Statement 12-12-18 8:30 am Dept M

Notice of Deposit - Jury

12/18/2018: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF MSC HEARING

5/17/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF MSC HEARING

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 07/29/2019

7/29/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 07/29/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

7/29/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department M; Jury Trial (with a 2 day estimate) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department M; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Final Status Conference) of 07/29/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF MSC HEARING); Filed by SHAVER, KORFF & CASTRONOVO LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Voss,Silverman & Braybrooke LLP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT); Filed by SHAVER, KORFF & CASTRONOVO LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (RE: Case Management Conference); Filed by SHAVER, KORFF & CASTRONOVO LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Case Management Conference;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by SHAVER, KORFF & CASTRONOVO LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by SHAVER, KORFF & CASTRONOVO LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SHAVER, KORFF & CASTRONOVO LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VOSS SILVERMAN & BRAYBROOKE LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where SHAVER KORFF CASTRONOVO LLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CASTRONOVO TOD M. ESQ.