This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 09:45:17 (UTC).

SHAUN RYAN MOONEY ET AL VS LUIS JAVIER CABRERA

Case Summary

On 02/26/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by SHAUN RYAN MOONEY against LUIS JAVIER CABRERA in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5947

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

MOONEY KOA

Defendants and Respondents

CABRERA LUIS JAVIER

DOES 1 TO 25

Minor

MOONEY KAILAYA

Guardian Ad Litem

MOONEY SHAUN RYAN

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

5/8/2018: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

DEFENDANT LUIS JAVIER CABRERAS ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

6/5/2018: DEFENDANT LUIS JAVIER CABRERAS ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

CIVIL DEPOSIT

6/5/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

2/1/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person

7/10/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

3/16/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

3/28/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

SUMMONS

4/6/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

2/26/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2021
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 2 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; : OSC RE Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 2 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • Hearingat 10:00 AM in Department 2 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Luis Javier Cabrera (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by James G. Stanley, Esq. (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Luis Javier Cabrera (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT LUIS JAVIER CABRERAS ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Luis Javier Cabrera (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Shaun Ryan Mooney (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Shaun Ryan Mooney (Legacy Party); Koa Mooney (Plaintiff); Kailaya Mooney (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Koa Mooney (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC695947    Hearing Date: February 11, 2020    Dept: 29

Mooney et al. v. Cabrera

Plaintiffs’ Motion to Change Order to Deposit Money into Blocked Account (Change Bank Location) is GRANTED.

On 11/13/19, the court signed orders approving compromise of the minors’ claims and ordering deposit of the funds into accounts for each minor claimant at Navy Federal Credit Union. Since the credit union is unable to facilitate blocked accounts, the court amends its order to permit deposit of the funds into blocked accounts for each minor claimant at Chase Bank, 1195 Calimesa Boulevard, Calimesa, CA 92320.

The court has inherent authority to amend any pleading or proceeding in other particulars. Cal Code Civil Procedure § 473(a)(1).

THE OSC RE PROOF OF DEPOSIT AND REQUETS FOR DISMISSAL remain scheduled for 3/12/2020 at 8:30 AM. In Department SS-29.  No appearance is required if the deposit receipt and request for dismissal are filed.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

Case Number: BC695947    Hearing Date: November 13, 2019    Dept: 2

Mooney, et al. v. Cabrera, BC695947

The parties having appeared (CRC 7.952(a)), and the court having reviewed and heard the Two Petitions to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim of a Minor (Kailaya Mooney and Koa Mooney), the court finds that the settlement is reasonable, and based thereon, approves and GRANTS the petitions.

The court approves the following distribution of the settlement proceeds:

KAILAYA MOONEY

Attorney’s fees (25%)

$2,250.00

Medical expenses

0.00

Costs

0.00

Total fees and costs

$2,250.00

Total Settlement

$9,000.00

Less credits

-2,250.00

Net Settlement for deposit into blocked account.

$6,750.00

KOA MOONEY

Attorney’s fees (25%)

$2,250.00

Medical expenses

0.00

Costs

0.00

Total fees and costs

$2,250.00

Total Settlement

$9,000.00

Less credits

-2,250.00

Net Settlement for deposit into blocked account.

$6,750.00

Counsel is ordered to submit proposed orders approving the petitions and for deposit into a blocked account.

THE COURT SETS AN OSC RE PROOF OF DEPOSIT AND OSC RE DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION ON 3/12/2020 AT 8:30 AM. No appearance required if receipt and request for dismissal are filed.

Moving party to give notice.