This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/21/2022 at 20:27:35 (UTC).

SHAUN RYAN ET AL VS ANINA FLURY ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/23/2017 SHAUN RYAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ANINA FLURY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL E. WHITAKER, STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH and GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3248

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RYAN SHAUN

POTTER LAURA

YUNG LENORA

Defendants

VILLA FABIENNE

HERTZ CORPORATION

FLURY ANINA

BUDGET RENT A CAR SYSTEM INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PANAH D. HESS

Defendant Attorney

BERGERSON JOHN MILLIAN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

10/31/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

10/17/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFFS FROM CALLING ANY EXPERT WITNESSES

10/13/2022: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFFS FROM CALLING ANY EXPERT WITNESSES

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO.2

10/12/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO.2

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4

10/12/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10

10/12/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9

10/12/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6

10/12/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7

10/12/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO.1

10/12/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO.1

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5

10/12/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9 TO EXCLUDE ANY EVIDENCE OF DAMAGE CLAIMS AGAINST AVIS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

10/12/2022: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9 TO EXCLUDE ANY EVIDENCE OF DAMAGE CLAIMS AGAINST AVIS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Jury Instructions - PROPOSED JOINT JURY INSTRUCTIONS

10/12/2022: Jury Instructions - PROPOSED JOINT JURY INSTRUCTIONS

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO EXCLUDE ANY SPECULATIVE TESTIMONY

10/12/2022: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO EXCLUDE ANY SPECULATIVE TESTIMONY

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE UNDEPOSED EXPERTS

10/12/2022: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE UNDEPOSED EXPERTS

Witness List - PROPOSED JOINT WITNESS LIST

10/12/2022: Witness List - PROPOSED JOINT WITNESS LIST

Exhibit List - JOINT EXHIBIT LIST

10/12/2022: Exhibit List - JOINT EXHIBIT LIST

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO.: 10 MOTION TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFFS FROM CALLING ANY EXPERT WITNESSES

10/12/2022: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO.: 10 MOTION TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFFS FROM CALLING ANY EXPERT WITNESSES

81 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2022
  • Hearing12/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Jury Trial - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketMotion in Limine (Motion To Exclude Plaintiffs From Calling Any Expert Witnesses); Filed by Anina Flury (Defendant); Fabienne Villa (Defendant); AVIS RENT A CAR SYSTEMS LLC formerly known as Avis Rent A Car Systems Inc (erroneously named and served as Budget Rent A Car Systems Inc.) Erroneously Sued As Budget Rent a Car System, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketProposed Joint Witness List; Filed by Laura Potter (Plaintiff); Shaun Ryan (Plaintiff); Lenora Yung (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketMotion in Limine (Motion In Limine No. 7 To Exclude Any Evidence Of Negligent Entrustment Memorandum Of Points And Authorities); Filed by Anina Flury (Defendant); Fabienne Villa (Defendant); AVIS RENT A CAR SYSTEMS LLC formerly known as Avis Rent A Car Systems Inc (erroneously named and served as Budget Rent A Car Systems Inc.) Erroneously Sued As Budget Rent a Car System, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketMotion in Limine (Motion In Limine No. 8 To Exclude Any Claim For Permissive Use Damages; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities); Filed by Anina Flury (Defendant); Fabienne Villa (Defendant); AVIS RENT A CAR SYSTEMS LLC formerly known as Avis Rent A Car Systems Inc (erroneously named and served as Budget Rent A Car Systems Inc.) Erroneously Sued As Budget Rent a Car System, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
104 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Shaun Ryan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Shaun Ryan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Laura Potter (Plaintiff); Shaun Ryan (Plaintiff); Lenora Yung (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Shaun Ryan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL; Filed by Laura Potter (Plaintiff); Shaun Ryan (Plaintiff); Lenora Yung (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Laura Potter (Plaintiff); Shaun Ryan (Plaintiff); Lenora Yung (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Laura Potter (Plaintiff); Shaun Ryan (Plaintiff); Lenora Yung (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****3248    Hearing Date: November 20, 2019    Dept: 5

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

SHAUN RYAN, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

v.

anina flury, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: ****3248

Hearing Date: November 20, 2019

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

Plaintiff’s motion to set aside dismissal

Plaintiffs Shaun Ryan, Laura Potter, and Lenora Yung (“Plaintiffs”) move to set aside the Court’s order of October 15, 2019, in which the Court dismissed this case after Plaintiffs failed to appear at the order to show cause why the Court should not dismiss this case for failure to enter defaults. The motion is granted.

Plaintiffs have advanced a declaration from their counsel, D. Hess Panah (“Counsel”). Counsel states that he failed to appear at trial because Counsel failed to properly calendar the trial date. (See Declaration of D. Hess Panah.) The Court concludes that the Court dismissed this case as a result of Counsel’s mistake. Plaintiff’s unopposed motion is granted per Code of Civil Procedure, section 473, subdivision (b).

DATED: November 20, 2019 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BUDGET RENT A CAR SYSTEM INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where The Hertz Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BERGERSON JOHN MILLIAN