This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/08/2020 at 23:29:31 (UTC).

SHAUN MITCHELL, ET AL. VS SUNLAND WOOD PRODUCTS INC.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 SHAUN MITCHELL filed an Other lawsuit against SUNLAND WOOD PRODUCTS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5242

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

MITCHELL COURTNEY

MITCHELL SHAUN

Respondent

SUNLAND WOOD PRODUCTS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BARTH JASON EDWARD

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/6/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Petition to Release Property - Mechanic's Lien

12/6/2019: Petition to Release Property - Mechanic's Lien

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/6/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/6/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/10/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Request for Dismissal

1/23/2020: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Shaun Mitchell (Petitioner); Courtney Mitchell (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Shaun Mitchell (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPetition to Release Property - Mechanic's Lien; Filed by Shaun Mitchell (Petitioner); Courtney Mitchell (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Shaun Mitchell (Petitioner); Courtney Mitchell (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sunland Wood Products, Inc., a California corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Barth, Jason E.