This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2021 at 05:04:29 (UTC).

SHATEE, ERICA LYNN VS ROESCH, CHARLES

Case Summary

On 10/05/2021 SHATEE, ERICA LYNN filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against ROESCH, CHARLES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BREDDAN, MATTHEW A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1417

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BREDDAN, MATTHEW A

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SHATEE ERICA LYNN

Respondent

ROESCH CHARLES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KNAUSS JOANNE MIRRAS

 

Court Documents

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - Granted

10/5/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - Granted

Petition - Civil Harassment

10/5/2021: Petition - Civil Harassment

Proof of Service - ch-130

10/26/2021: Proof of Service - ch-130

Minute Order

10/26/2021: Minute Order

Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

10/26/2021: Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

Proof of Service - Electronic

10/25/2021: Proof of Service - Electronic

Proof of Service - ch-109 110, 100, 120, cyh-250

10/25/2021: Proof of Service - ch-109 110, 100, 120, cyh-250

Request - Mod/Term a Restraining Order (Form 600)

12/10/2021: Request - Mod/Term a Restraining Order (Form 600)

Application - Terminate Restraining Order - Request to Terminate Civil Harassment Restraining Order

12/10/2021: Application - Terminate Restraining Order - Request to Terminate Civil Harassment Restraining Order

Notice - Hrg on Req to Mod/Term Restraining Order (Form 610)

12/10/2021: Notice - Hrg on Req to Mod/Term Restraining Order (Form 610)

Application - Terminate Restraining Order - Request to Terminate Civil Harassment Restraining Order

12/10/2021: Application - Terminate Restraining Order - Request to Terminate Civil Harassment Restraining Order

Application - Terminate Restraining Order - Request to Terminate Civil Harassment Restraining Order

12/10/2021: Application - Terminate Restraining Order - Request to Terminate Civil Harassment Restraining Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2022
  • Hearing01/04/2022 at 8:30 AM in Department D at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Request for Order re: Modification Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hrg on Req to Mod/Term Restraining Order (Form 610); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketProposed Form 630 - Mod/Term Restraining Order; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department D, Breddan, Matthew A, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Granted - RO Before Evidence by both

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing (Form 130); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (ch-130 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (ch-109 110, 100, 120, cyh-250 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (Electronic ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (Granted ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KNAUSS JOANNE MIRRAS