This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/10/2023 at 00:19:46 (UTC).

SHATAIRAH JANICE WILSON, ET AL. VS STROPA INVESTMENTS 2, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/04/2022 SHATAIRAH JANICE WILSON, filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against STROPA INVESTMENTS 2, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2491

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRAYLOR ANIELLE

Defendant

STROPA INVESTMENTS 2 LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENJI DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

4/27/2023: Request for Dismissal

Declaration - DECLARATION RE PROOF OF PURCHASE OF ANNUITY FOR EMIYAH ISLAND

4/12/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION RE PROOF OF PURCHASE OF ANNUITY FOR EMIYAH ISLAND

Declaration - DECLARATION RE PROOF OF PURCHASE OF ANNUITY FOR EMONIE ISLAND

4/12/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION RE PROOF OF PURCHASE OF ANNUITY FOR EMONIE ISLAND

Declaration - DECLARATION RE PROOF OF PURCHASE OF ANNUITY FOR SHATARI WILSON

4/12/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION RE PROOF OF PURCHASE OF ANNUITY FOR SHATARI WILSON

Declaration - DECLARATION RE PROOF OF PURCHASE OF ANNUITY FOR EMERY ISLAND

4/12/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION RE PROOF OF PURCHASE OF ANNUITY FOR EMERY ISLAND

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT); ORDER TO SHOW...)

2/9/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT); ORDER TO SHOW...)

Notice of Ruling

12/27/2022: Notice of Ruling

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

12/13/2022: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

12/13/2022: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

12/13/2022: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

12/13/2022: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE - SHATAIRAH...)

12/12/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE - SHATAIRAH...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE - SHATAIRAH...)

12/7/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE - SHATAIRAH...)

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

11/22/2022: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

11/22/2022: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

11/22/2022: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

11/22/2022: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR EMERY

11/17/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR EMERY

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by SHATAIRAH JANICE WILSON, et al. on 10/04/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by SHATAIRAH JANICE WILSON as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: SHATAIRAH JANICE WILSON (Plaintiff); EMERY UNIQUE ISLAND (Plaintiff); EMIYAH REE ISLAND (Plaintiff); Emonie Renae Island (Plaintiff); Anielle Traylor (Plaintiff); As to: STROPA INVESTMENTS 2, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 05/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/27/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Proof of Purchase of Annuity scheduled for 05/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/27/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketDeclaration re Proof of Purchase of Annuity for Emery Island; Filed by: EMERY UNIQUE ISLAND (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketDeclaration re Proof of Purchase of Annuity for Emonie Island; Filed by: Emonie Renae Island (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketDeclaration re Proof of Purchase of Annuity for Emiyah Island; Filed by: EMIYAH REE ISLAND (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketDeclaration re Proof of Purchase of Annuity for Shatari Wilson; Filed by: SHATAIRAH JANICE WILSON (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 05/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Proof of Purchase of Annuity scheduled for 05/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
77 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Emiyah: Status Date changed from 10/06/2022 to 10/04/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel M. Crowley in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SHATAIRAH JANICE WILSON (Plaintiff); EMERY UNIQUE ISLAND (Plaintiff); EMIYAH REE ISLAND (Plaintiff); EMONIE RENAE ISLAND, by and through their guardian ad litem, ANIELLE TRAYLOR (Plaintiff); As to: STROPA INVESTMENTS 2, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 03/19/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 10/01/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******2491 Hearing Date: December 7, 2022 Dept: 28

The Court would like to speak with the Petitioner and Claimant, Shatairah Janice Wilson.