This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/10/2021 at 17:17:50 (UTC).

SHARON YOUNG VS FOREST LAWN MEMORIAL-PARK ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/03/2021 SHARON YOUNG filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FOREST LAWN MEMORIAL-PARK ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2790

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YOUNG SHARON

Defendants

DRAPER MORTUARY SERVICE CORPORATION INTERNATIONAL A TEXAS CORPORATION

FOREST LAWN MEMORIAL-PARK ASSOCIATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SANDS THOMAS

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/3/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/3/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/3/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/8/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2022
  • Hearing01/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sharon Young (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sharon Young (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sharon Young (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FOREST LAWN MEMORIAL-PARK ASSOCIATION AKA FOREST LAWN MEMORIAL PARK MORTUARY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SANDS THOMAS