Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/19/2021 at 11:21:08 (UTC).

SHARON SWEENEY, AN INDIVIDUAL VS SPEEDY FUEL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/02/2020 SHARON SWEENEY, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SPEEDY FUEL, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4971

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SWEENEY AN INDIVIDUAL SHARON

Defendants

SPEEDY FUEL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY A DELAWARE CORPORATION

BP PRODUCTS NORTH AMERICA INC. FORMERLY OPERATING AS BP WEST COAST PRODUCTS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AZIZI DANIEL

Defendant Attorney

MITCHEL STEVEN M.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

1/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

10/27/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/29/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

9/29/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

9/29/2020: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/25/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/27/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

7/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

7/9/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/2/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/2/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/2/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/2/2020: Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2023
  • Hearing06/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • Hearing12/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • Hearing12/16/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by SHARON SWEENEY, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by SHARON SWEENEY, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SPEEDY FUEL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by SPEEDY FUEL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by SPEEDY FUEL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by SHARON SWEENEY, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by SHARON SWEENEY, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedure and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SHARON SWEENEY, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SHARON SWEENEY, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SHARON SWEENEY, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPEEDY FUEL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where BP PRODUCTS NORTH AMERICA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY is a litigant