This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/20/2022 at 14:04:06 (UTC).

SHARON O'DONNELL VS RIOT GAMES INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/07/2021 SHARON O'DONNELL filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against RIOT GAMES INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIHU M. BERLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0596

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIHU M. BERLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

O'DONNELL SHARON

Defendants

RIOT GAMES INC.

LAURENT NICOLAS

Not Classified By Court

DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BALTAXE MICHAEL F

FELDER VICTORIA VELIZAROVA

KAPLAN ROBERT

RAMEZ KASRA BRENDON

KAPLAN ROBERT A.

Defendant Attorneys

RANOA KATRYN HOPE ECHIVERRI

SMITH KATHERINE V

CONWAY CATHERINE ANNE

Not Classified By Court Attorney

PROCTOR MELANIE L.

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL F. BALTAXE

3/17/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL F. BALTAXE

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SETTING A STATUS CONFERENCE

3/16/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SETTING A STATUS CONFERENCE

Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice - APPLICATION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE OF GABRIELLE E. TENZER

3/19/2021: Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice - APPLICATION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE OF GABRIELLE E. TENZER

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SHARON O'DONNELL

3/17/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SHARON O'DONNELL

Order - ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT RIOT GAMES, INC.'S & NICOLO LAURENT'S EX PARTE;

3/17/2021: Order - ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT RIOT GAMES, INC.'S & NICOLO LAURENT'S EX PARTE;

Declaration - DECLARATION OF EMILY WINKLE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY CIVIL COURT PROCEEDINGS

3/23/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF EMILY WINKLE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY CIVIL COURT PROCEEDINGS

Initial Status Conference Order

3/5/2021: Initial Status Conference Order

Complaint

1/7/2021: Complaint

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/19/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Joint Status Conference Report - JOINT STATUS REPORT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING ARBITRATION

8/10/2022: Joint Status Conference Report - JOINT STATUS REPORT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING ARBITRATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE ARBITRATION)

1/20/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE ARBITRATION)

Status Report - JOINT STATUS REPORT REGARDING ARBITRATION

1/7/2022: Status Report - JOINT STATUS REPORT REGARDING ARBITRATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE ARBITRATION)

7/7/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE ARBITRATION)

Status Report - JOINT STATUS REPORT REGARDING ARBITRATION

6/28/2021: Status Report - JOINT STATUS REPORT REGARDING ARBITRATION

Order - ADMITTING ROBERTA A. KAPLAN AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

4/9/2021: Order - ADMITTING ROBERTA A. KAPLAN AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

Order - ORDER ADMITTING GABRIELLE E. TENZER AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

4/9/2021: Order - ORDER ADMITTING GABRIELLE E. TENZER AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING ARBITRATION

4/6/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING ARBITRATION

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE

3/23/2021: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2023
  • Hearing02/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 6 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 02/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Post-Arbitration Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketPost-Arbitration Status Conference scheduled for 08/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 6 updated: Result Date to 08/19/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketJoint Status Report and [Proposed] Order Regarding Arbitration; Filed by: Riot Games Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketPost-Arbitration Status Conference scheduled for 08/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Status Conference Re Arbitration)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference Re Arbitration scheduled for 01/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 6 updated: Result Date to 01/20/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketJoint Status Report Regarding Arbitration; Filed by: Riot Games Inc. (Defendant); Nicolas Laurent (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketStatus Conference Re Arbitration scheduled for 01/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order Joint Stipulation and [proposed] Order to Modify Time to Respond To Complaint: Filed By: Nicolas Laurent (Defendant),Riot Games Inc. (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 02/08/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order Joint Stipulation and [proposed] Order to Modify Time to Respond To Complaint: Status Date changed from 02/03/2021 to 02/08/2021; Result Date changed from 02/08/2021 to 02/08/2021; As To Parties changed from Sharon O'Donnell (Plaintiff) to Sharon O'Donnell (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Sharon O'Donnell (Plaintiff); As to: Riot Games Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 01/08/2021; Service Cost: 80.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Sharon O'Donnell (Plaintiff); As to: Riot Games Inc. (Defendant); Nicolas Laurent (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Sharon O'Donnell (Plaintiff); As to: Riot Games Inc. (Defendant); Nicolas Laurent (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Sharon O'Donnell (Plaintiff); As to: Riot Games Inc. (Defendant); Nicolas Laurent (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 17 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RIOT GAMES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PROCTOR MELANIE LEA