Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 09:22:57 (UTC).

SHARON MENDOZA ET AL VS CATEPILLAR INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/14/2017 SHARON MENDOZA filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against CATEPILLAR INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BRIAN S. CURREY and DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8028

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BRIAN S. CURREY

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

MENDOZA STEVEN

MENDOZA SHARON

Defendants and Respondents

DEERE & COMPANY

DANA COMPANIES LLC

DANA CORPORATION

CATEPILLAR INC

DEAN'S MATERIALS INC

CROWN CORK & SEAL INC

DEAN R. SHORE INC

J.T. THORPE AND SONS INC.

GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC

O'REILLY AUTO ENTERPRISES LLC FKA CSK

CROWN CORK & SEAL INC.

HILL BROTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANY

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

RAYMUS HOMES INC.

WESTERN BUILDING MATERIALS CO.

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.

SAN JOAQUIN LUMBER COMPANY

DOES 1-300

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

RILEY SAFER HOLMES & CANCILA LLP

DEBLASE PATRICK ESQ.

EYERLY MICHAEL C. ESQ.

HUGO PARKER LLP

SACK MILLER & ROSENIN LLP

MANNING GROSS + MASSENBURG LLP

ULLOA EDWARD R.

SCHIRM BARRY R.

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

DEBLASE PATRICK ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

7/16/2019: Minute Order

Request for Dismissal

4/22/2019: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

2/25/2019: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

4/22/2019: Request for Dismissal

Exhibit List

3/18/2019: Exhibit List

Jury Instructions

3/18/2019: Jury Instructions

Motion in Limine

3/12/2019: Motion in Limine

Motion in Limine

3/12/2019: Motion in Limine

Opposition

3/12/2019: Opposition

Opposition

3/12/2019: Opposition

Motion in Limine

2/27/2019: Motion in Limine

Motion in Limine

2/28/2019: Motion in Limine

Motion in Limine

2/28/2019: Motion in Limine

Motion in Limine

2/28/2019: Motion in Limine

Motion in Limine

2/28/2019: Motion in Limine

Objection

3/4/2019: Objection

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

5/1/2017: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

5/1/2017: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

94 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 15, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (status of settlement (Re Mendoza-BC658028)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 07/16/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: status of settlement (Re Mendoza-BC65...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Sharon Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Sharon Mendoza (Plaintiff); Steven Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Not Entered); Filed by Sharon Mendoza (Plaintiff); Steven Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 15, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 15, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Jury Trial ((Re Mendoza-BC658028)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketOrder Regarding O'Reilly Auto Enterprises LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication; Filed by O'REILLY AUTO ENTERPRISES, LLC FKA CSK (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
97 More Docket Entries
  • 05/05/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM 1. NEGLIGENCE ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sharon Mendoza (Plaintiff); Steven Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CATEPILLAR INC is a litigant

Latest cases where WESTERN BUILDING MATERIALS CO. is a litigant

Latest cases where O'REILLY AUTO ENTERPRISES DBA O'REILLY is a litigant

Latest cases where J. T. THORPE & SON INC. is a litigant