This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/12/2019 at 15:00:49 (UTC).

SHARON BOSCO VS DANIEL LEW MD ETAL

Case Summary

On 05/11/2017 SHARON BOSCO filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against DANIEL LEW MD ETAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1179

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BOSCO SHARON

Defendants and Respondents

COHEN ERICA R. MEDICAL DOCTOR

LEW DANIEL MEDICAL DOCTOR

DOES 1 TO 100

HERVIEUX ADRIENNE MEDICAL DOCTOR

SHIH DAVID MEDICAL DOCTOR

CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

KRAMER BRADLEY I. ESQ.

LAW OFFICES OF BRADLEY I. KRAMER

KRAMER BRADLEY I

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

WEISS DAVID J. ESQ.

MOORE RAYMOND R. ESQ.

MOORE MCLENNAN LLP

LAW OFFICES OF DAVID J. WEISS

 

Court Documents

ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT BY DEFENDANT, ADRIENNE HERVIEUX, M.D.

2/21/2018: ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT BY DEFENDANT, ADRIENNE HERVIEUX, M.D.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

2/22/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL

3/7/2018: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL

Minute Order

10/25/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/25/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/13/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

11/13/2018: Unknown

APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT ADRIENNE HERVIEUX, M.D. FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT; DECLARATION OF ARTHUR E. ZITSOW

1/16/2018: APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT ADRIENNE HERVIEUX, M.D. FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT; DECLARATION OF ARTHUR E. ZITSOW

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT BY DEFENDANT, ADRIENNE HERV1EUX, M.D.

1/16/2018: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT BY DEFENDANT, ADRIENNE HERV1EUX, M.D.

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. WRONGFUL DEATH

5/11/2017: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. WRONGFUL DEATH

SUMMONS

5/11/2017: SUMMONS

DECLARATION BY TRIAL ATTORNEY [FORMERLY PURSUANT TO SECTION 9 OF THE COURT RULES OF. COURT JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION STANDARDS]

6/13/2017: DECLARATION BY TRIAL ATTORNEY [FORMERLY PURSUANT TO SECTION 9 OF THE COURT RULES OF. COURT JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION STANDARDS]

NOTICE OF NON-STIPULATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS TEMPORARY JUDGE

6/13/2017: NOTICE OF NON-STIPULATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS TEMPORARY JUDGE

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT ADRIENNE HERVIEUX, M.D.

6/13/2017: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT ADRIENNE HERVIEUX, M.D.

DANIEL LEW, M.D., CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER; DAVID SHIH, M.D. AND ERICA R. COHEN, M.D.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

6/16/2017: DANIEL LEW, M.D., CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER; DAVID SHIH, M.D. AND ERICA R. COHEN, M.D.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

CIVIL DEPOSIT

8/10/2017: CIVIL DEPOSIT

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4; Jury Trial - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Jury Trial) of 11/13/2018); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 4; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • at 1:00 PM in Department 4; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Hervieux, Adrienne, Medical Doctor (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2017
  • DANIEL LEW, M.D., CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER; DAVID SHIH, M.D. AND ERICA R. COHEN, M.D.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Hervieux, Adrienne, Medical Doctor (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Hervieux, Adrienne, Medical Doctor (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by Hervieux, Adrienne, Medical Doctor (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • NOTICE OF NON-STIPULATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS TEMPORARY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT ADRIENNE HERVIEUX, M.D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • DECLARATION BY TRIAL ATTORNEY [FORMERLY PURSUANT TO SECTION 9 OF THE COURT RULES OF. COURT JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION STANDARDS]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. WRONGFUL DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Sharon Bosco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KRAMER BRADLEY I.