This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/26/2022 at 10:54:08 (UTC).

SHARON BECKETT VS AIRBNB, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/15/2021 SHARON BECKETT filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against AIRBNB, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4012

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BECKETT SHARON

Defendants

14042 LYNMARK STREET APARTMENTS

AIRBNB INC.

AIRBNB PAYMENTS INC.

PERERA CHAMPA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSEN JANFAZA ILAN N.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/15/2021: Complaint

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

9/15/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

10/14/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

10/14/2021: PI General Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2024
  • Hearing09/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • Hearing03/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • Hearing03/01/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: SHARON BECKETT (Plaintiff); As to: AIRBNB, INC. (Defendant); AIRBNB PAYMENTS, INC. (Defendant); 14042 LYNMARK STREET APARTMENTS (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SHARON BECKETT (Plaintiff); As to: AIRBNB, INC. (Defendant); AIRBNB PAYMENTS, INC. (Defendant); 14042 LYNMARK STREET APARTMENTS (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: SHARON BECKETT (Plaintiff); As to: AIRBNB, INC. (Defendant); AIRBNB PAYMENTS, INC. (Defendant); 14042 LYNMARK STREET APARTMENTS (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: SHARON BECKETT (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: SHARON BECKETT (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 03/01/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 09/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William A. Crowfoot in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Airbnb Payments, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where AIRBNB is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSEN JANFAZA ILAN N