This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/10/2020 at 16:56:12 (UTC).

SHARMAGNE LELAND ST JOHN VS GRANT WASDEN

Case Summary

On 02/13/2018 SHARMAGNE LELAND ST JOHN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GRANT WASDEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK, KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and MARK A. BORENSTEIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3863

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LELAND-ST JOHN SHARMAGNE

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 100

WASDEN GRANT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GABRIEL JONATHAN G. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

WILLIAMS CLAIRE ESQ.

WILLIAMS CLAIRE ETTEMA ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;)

4/29/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;) OF 04/29/2020

4/29/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;) OF 04/29/2020

Notice of Ruling

1/24/2020: Notice of Ruling

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF OR REFERENCE TO DEFENDANT'S LIABILITY INSURANCE

1/17/2020: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF OR REFERENCE TO DEFENDANT'S LIABILITY INSURANCE

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 FOR AN ORDER PROHIBITING PLAINTIFF FROM ARGUING/IMPOSING AN IMPROPER STANDARD OF CARE

1/17/2020: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 FOR AN ORDER PROHIBITING PLAINTIFF FROM ARGUING/IMPOSING AN IMPROPER STANDARD OF CARE

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE, ARGUMENT AND REFERENCE TO DEFENDANT FORCING PLAINTIFF TO GO TO TRIAL OR DELAYING THE TRIAL

1/17/2020: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE, ARGUMENT AND REFERENCE TO DEFENDANT FORCING PLAINTIFF TO GO TO TRIAL OR DELAYING THE TRIAL

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE/PRECLUDE/PROHIBIT EVIDENCE OF MEDICAL EXPENSES OTHER THAN THE RATE NEGOTIATED BY PLAINTIFF'S INSURANCE COMPANY

1/17/2020: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE/PRECLUDE/PROHIBIT EVIDENCE OF MEDICAL EXPENSES OTHER THAN THE RATE NEGOTIATED BY PLAINTIFF'S INSURANCE COMPANY

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE/PRECLUDE/PROHIBIT PLAINTIFF'S USE OF OR ARGUMENT REGARDING THE GOLDEN RULE

1/17/2020: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE/PRECLUDE/PROHIBIT PLAINTIFF'S USE OF OR ARGUMENT REGARDING THE GOLDEN RULE

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF DEFENDANT'S WEALTH OR ASSETS AT TRIAL

1/17/2020: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF DEFENDANT'S WEALTH OR ASSETS AT TRIAL

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND TRIAL

1/22/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND TRIAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE MANDATORY SETTLEM...)

1/22/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE MANDATORY SETTLEM...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE)

12/31/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE)

Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

11/1/2019: Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

8/19/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

7/30/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

7/30/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

5/18/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

2/13/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2021
  • Hearing02/16/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • Hearing12/31/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • Hearing08/31/2020 at 10:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: COVID-19;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: COVID-19;) of 04/29/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Sharmagne Leland-St John (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue Mandatory Settlement Conference and Trial, Filed by the Plaintiff) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Grant Wasden (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Grant Wasden (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT GRANT WASDEN; DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Sharmagne Leland-St John (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Sharmagne Leland-St John (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE-CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sharmagne Leland-St John (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC693863    Hearing Date: December 31, 2019    Dept: 2

St. John v. Wasden

Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Philip E. Pitzer filed on 12/5/19 is GRANTED. Counsel has complied with California Rules of Court 9.40.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

Case Number: BC693863    Hearing Date: December 04, 2019    Dept: 2

St. John v. Wasden

Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Philip E. Pitzer is TAKEN OFF CALENDAR for procedural defects. The Application is not accompanied by a Notice of Hearing. Cal Rules of Court 9.40(c). The proof of service does not indicate that the California State Bar was served with notice. Rule 9.40(c)(1). The applicant does not indicate that the $50 fee was paid to the State Bar of California. Rule 9.40(e).

Counsel is ordered to comply with Cal Rules of Court Rule 9.40.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.