This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/03/2019 at 04:15:52 (UTC).

SHANTA OWENS VS CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/13/2018 SHANTA OWENS filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BRIAN S. CURREY and DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8280

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BRIAN S. CURREY

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OWENS SHANTA

Defendants

CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY

THE VONS COMPANIES INC.

FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA INC.

RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

SAFEWAY INC.

SOCO WEST INC.

IMERYS TALC AMERICA INC. FKA LUZENAC AMERICA INC.

CYPRUS MINERALS COMPANY

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. FKA JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES INC.

THE KROGER CO.

BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA

COLGATE-PALMOLIVE COMPANY

BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES INC.

CYPRUS MINES CORPORATION DOE 4

WHITTAKER CLARK & DANIELS INC. FKA DOE 6

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

KANNETT MARK SIMON

DEJARDIN BRADFORD JOHN

CALFO ALEXANDER GERARD

D'ORO FRANK JOSEPH JR

ROMANO JULIA ELIZABETH

ZADOROZNY BRENT J

MURRIN CHARLES P.

VANDAM TINA BROCCARDO

MURDICA JAMES FRANCIS

KO SANDRA MEEYOUN

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

5/15/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE AS TO CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY ONLY

5/2/2019: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE AS TO CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY ONLY

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

4/29/2019: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Proof of Personal Service

4/16/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

3/22/2019: Answer

Order - Order Granting Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for an Order Granting the Application for Admission of James M. Kramer to the Bar of this Court Pro Hac Vice

3/4/2019: Order - Order Granting Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for an Order Granting the Application for Admission of James M. Kramer to the Bar of this Court Pro Hac Vice

Proof of Personal Service

3/8/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service of Summons and Complaint

2/7/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service of Summons and Complaint

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

1/28/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Notice - Notice of Intent of Defendant Imerys Talc America, Inc. to Bifurcate successor liability issue

1/24/2019: Notice - Notice of Intent of Defendant Imerys Talc America, Inc. to Bifurcate successor liability issue

Order - Order Granting Ex Parte Application for Admission of Rebecca Hausman Pro Hac Vice

1/16/2019: Order - Order Granting Ex Parte Application for Admission of Rebecca Hausman Pro Hac Vice

Ex Parte Application - Ex Parte Application for an order granting the application for admission of Rebecca Hausman to the bar of this court Pro Hac Vice;

1/15/2019: Ex Parte Application - Ex Parte Application for an order granting the application for admission of Rebecca Hausman to the bar of this court Pro Hac Vice;

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application of plaintiffs for an order gr...)

1/16/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application of plaintiffs for an order gr...)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

1/18/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

1/18/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service of Summons and Complaint

1/3/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service of Summons and Complaint

Answer

1/9/2019: Answer

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/13/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

67 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 15, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (of Specially Appearing Defendant, Whittaker, Clark & Daniels Inc., to Quash Service of Summons for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Owens-18STCV08280)) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 07/16/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Taking Off Calendar of Specially Appearing Defendant Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc. Motion to Quash for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Death of Plaintiff Shanta Owens); Filed by Shanta Owens (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Shanta Owens (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 15, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (of Specially Appearing Defendant, Whittaker, Clark & Daniels Inc., to Quash Service of Summons for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Owens-18STCV08280)) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Sandra Meeyoun Ko (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Sandra Meeyoun Ko (Attorney); James Francis Murdica (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by James Francis Murdica (Attorney); Sandra Meeyoun Ko (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
68 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Shanta Owens (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Shanta Owens (Plaintiff); Johnson & Johnson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (of Summons and Complaint); Filed by Shanta Owens (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (of Summons and Complaint); Filed by Shanta Owens (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (of Summons and Complaint); Filed by Shanta Owens (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (of Summons and Complaint); Filed by Shanta Owens (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Shanta Owens (Plaintiff); The Kroger Co. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Shanta Owens (Plaintiff); Ralphs Grocery Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (of Summons and Complaint); Filed by Shanta Owens (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketEx Parte Application (for an order granting the application for admission of Paul Dix to the bar of this court pro hac vice); Filed by Shanta Owens (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less