This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2019 at 09:09:17 (UTC).

SHANNON COLHOUN VS LOU CHAR FULLER PROPERTY LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/18/2017 SHANNON COLHOUN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LOU CHAR FULLER PROPERTY LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DENNIS J. LANDIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2909

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DENNIS J. LANDIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COLHOUN SHANNON

Defendants

LOU-CHAR FULLER PROPERTY LLC

TIGNER LOUISE

TIGNER MAREK

NBK REALTY MANAGEMENT INC.

JONES CHARLOTTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LIU PENNIE P

PEREZ JONATHAN JOSEPH

ASVAR CHRISTOPHER A.

Defendant Attorneys

HARRIS CHARLES LANE

HURWITZ ANDRES

CAMACHO ANDRES

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

1/29/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

1/29/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; ETC.

2/13/2018: AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; ETC.

RULING RE: MOTION TO STRIKE

2/14/2018: RULING RE: MOTION TO STRIKE

Minute Order

2/14/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

2/16/2018: Unknown

Unknown

2/21/2018: Unknown

DEMAND FOR JURY AND NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 631

2/21/2018: DEMAND FOR JURY AND NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 631

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE

2/22/2018: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE

PLAINTIFF'S DEMAND FOR JURY AND NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES PURSUANT TO C C P 631

2/27/2018: PLAINTIFF'S DEMAND FOR JURY AND NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES PURSUANT TO C C P 631

Minute Order

3/8/2018: Minute Order

RULING RE: MOTION TO STRIKE

3/8/2018: RULING RE: MOTION TO STRIKE

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

3/9/2018: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF RULING

3/9/2018: NOTICE OF RULING

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

3/9/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF PLAINTIFF, SHANNON COLHOUN, TO DEFENDANTS' ANSWER;

3/23/2018: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF PLAINTIFF, SHANNON COLHOUN, TO DEFENDANTS' ANSWER;

APPLICATION AND ORDER ALLOWING AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT; ETC

4/4/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER ALLOWING AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT; ETC

DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S DEMURRER TO DEFENDANTS' ANSWER

4/5/2018: DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S DEMURRER TO DEFENDANTS' ANSWER

129 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to continue trial) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to continue trial)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketOpposition (DEFENDANTS LIMITED OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 TO EXCLUDE MEDICAL TESTIMONY BY DEFENDANTS EXPERT MICHAEL MORSE, Ph.D.; DECLARATION OF ANDRES CAMACHO); Filed by Lou-Char Fuller Property, LLC (Defendant); NBK Realty Management, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketOpposition (DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 TO ALLOW PLAINTIFF TO PRESENT EVIDENCE OF DEFENSE COUNSEL STATEMENTS TO DEFENDANTS EXPERTS, TO THE COURT, AND TO PLAINTIFF); Filed by Lou-Char Fuller Property, LLC (Defendant); NBK Realty Management, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketOpposition (DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF DEFENSE EXPERT JOHN LOUD; DECLARATION OF ANDRES CAMACHO); Filed by Lou-Char Fuller Property, LLC (Defendant); NBK Realty Management, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketOpposition (DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO ADMIT EVIDENCE OF CHANGES TO THE SWIMMING POOL); Filed by Lou-Char Fuller Property, LLC (Defendant); NBK Realty Management, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to continue trial) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application;)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (To Continue Trial and Reopen Discovery); Filed by Lou-Char Fuller Property, LLC (Defendant); NBK Realty Management, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketNotice (regarding continued hearing regarding defendants Ex Parte); Filed by Charlotte Jones (Defendant); Lou-Char Fuller Property, LLC (Defendant); NBK Realty Management, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
206 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketOpposition Document; Filed by Shannon Colhoun (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketMotion to Strike; Filed by Lou-Char Fuller Property, LLC (Defendant); NBK Realty Management, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKIE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Shannon Colhoun (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT 1. NEGLIGENCE ;ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****2909    Hearing Date: January 06, 2020    Dept: 51

Tentative rulings rate: motions in limine

Plaintiffs motion to:

  1. Exclude unrelated medical conditions: grant in part, gynecological treatment will not be admitted, some evidence of psychological treatment may be admitted.

4. Admit evidence of changes to pool: deny

7. Exclude testimony of Morse: deny

8. Exclude evidence that was subject of subpoena quashed by court: deny

9. Exclude testimony of Albert Stone: deny

11. Exclude testimony regarding additional testing by Loud: deny

12. Exclude testimony by expert of case specific facts: likely grant if Dunn and Pearl do not testify

Defendant’s motion to:

  1. Preclude evidence of subsequent remedial measures: grant

  2. Exclude evidence that pool and electrical system pose a safety hazard: grant

  3. Exclude evidence of defendant’s poor response to inspections: defer

  4. Exclude evidence regarding cover-up: grant

  5. Exclude evidence of alleged poor maintenance unrelated to electrical system: grant

  6. Limit testimony of Derrigo: grant

  7. Exclude opinion of Johnson regarding pool light: defer

  8. Exclude testimony of Solomon regarding biomechanics and defendant’s negligence: deny, but some opinions re: negligence may be excluded.

  9. Exclude testimony regarding code violations: grant

  10. Exclude animation of pool’s electrical system: defer- the Court will need to review the animation.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NBK REALTY MANAGEMENT INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ASVAR CHRISTOPHER A.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LIU PENNIE P